EP3171804 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR FOR AN ELECTROSURGICAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Creo Medical Limited Creo House, Unit 2 Beaufort Park Beaufort Park Way Chepstow Wales NP16 5UH / GB | [2020/51] |
Former [2017/22] | For all designated states Creo Medical Limited Riverside Court Beaufort Park Chepstow, Monmouthshire NP16 5UH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANCOCK, Christopher Paul Flat 5 Chilton Court Tyning Lane Bath Bath and North East Somerset BA1 6EQ / GB | 02 /
AMOAH, Francis Creo Medical Limited Riverside Court Beaufort Park Chepstow Monmouthshire NP16 5UH / GB | 03 /
EBBUTT, Julian Mark Bramley Barn Lower Daffaluke Glewstone Ross-on-Wye Herefordshire HR9 6EQ / GB | 04 /
GARDNER, Jeremy Paul Unit 2 Windsor Business Centre Vansittart Estate Windsor Berkshire SL4 1SP / GB | 05 /
CROSSLEY, Robin Alexander Unit 2 Windsor Business Centre Vansittart Estate Windsor Berkshire SL4 1SP / GB | 06 /
MONICO, Rohan 35 Beckgrove Close Cardiff South Glamorgan CF24 2SE / GB | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/02] |
Former [2017/22] | Johnson, Richard Alan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15741301.4 | 20.07.2015 | [2017/22] | WO2015GB52099 | Priority number, date | GB20140012910 | 21.07.2014 Original published format: GB 201412910 | [2017/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016012773 | Date: | 28.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3171804 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3171804 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12, // A61B46/10 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
A61B18/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61B46/10 (EP,GB,KR,US);
A61B18/1206 (US);
A61B18/14 (GB);
A61B18/18 (GB);
A61B90/08 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2017/22] | A61B18/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBINDER FÜR EINE ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2017/22] | English: | ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR FOR AN ELECTROSURGICAL APPARATUS | [2017/22] | French: | CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE POUR APPAREIL ÉLECTROCHIRURGICAL | [2017/22] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 24.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.07.2015 | AL | 13.01.2021 | CY | 13.01.2021 | EE | 13.01.2021 | FI | 13.01.2021 | HR | 13.01.2021 | LT | 13.01.2021 | LV | 13.01.2021 | MC | 13.01.2021 | MK | 13.01.2021 | MT | 13.01.2021 | PL | 13.01.2021 | RO | 13.01.2021 | RS | 13.01.2021 | SI | 13.01.2021 | SK | 13.01.2021 | SM | 13.01.2021 | BG | 13.04.2021 | IS | 13.05.2021 | LU | 20.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 20.07.2015 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
MK | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 20.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 20.07.2015 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 20.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 20.07.2015 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 20.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 20.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | EE | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | EE | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
LT | 13.01.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4914521 (ADAIR EDWIN L [US]) [A] 1-17 * figures 1,6 *; | [Y]DE29814892U (STEIDLE EDUARD DIPL ING [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5873814 (ADAIR EDWIN L [US]) [Y] 1-17 * column 12, paragraph 50 - column 13, paragraph 35; figure 16 *; | [A]US6338657 (HARPER RICHARD M [US], et al) [A] 10-15 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2008059248 (BROOKE GERARD MICHAEL [GB]) [A] 1-17 * figures 8,9 *; | [XP]EP2854236 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [XP] 1,2,4,6,7,9,17* paragraphs [0065] - [0068]; figures 4,8-10 *; | [XP]WO2015042898 (COVIDIEN LP [US], et al) [XP] 1-4,6,9,17 * paragraph [0058]; figures 4,7 * |