EP3178169 - METHODS EXPLOITING ASYMMETRIC CAPABILITIES FOR CONTENTION-BASED RANDOM ACCESS IN MM-WAVE ACCESS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAGHAVAN, Vasanthan c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Sundar c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
LI, Junyi c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
SAMPATH, Ashwin c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2017/24] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15741696.7 | 01.07.2015 | [2017/24] | WO2015US38770 | Priority number, date | US201414452510 | 05.08.2014 Original published format: US201414452510 | [2017/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016022235 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3178169 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0456, H04B7/06, H04B7/08 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
H04B7/046 (EP,CN,US);
H04W16/28 (US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/088 (EP,CN,US);
H04W48/16 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/24] | H04B7/04, H04B7/06, H04B7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSNUTZUNG ASYMMETRISCHER FÄHIGKEITEN FÜR ZUGANGSKONFLIKTBASIERTEN DIREKTZUGRIFF IN MM-WELLENZUGANGSSYSTEMEN | [2017/24] | English: | METHODS EXPLOITING ASYMMETRIC CAPABILITIES FOR CONTENTION-BASED RANDOM ACCESS IN MM-WAVE ACCESS SYSTEMS | [2017/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'EXPLOITATION DE CAPACITÉS ASYMÉTRIQUES POUR UN ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE BASÉ SUR UNE CONTENTION DANS DES SYSTÈMES D'ACCÈS À ONDES MILLIMÉTRIQUES | [2017/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 05.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 17.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2013025070 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [I] 1-28* paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0125] *; | [XI]US2013301454 (SEOL JI-YUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-12,14-19,21-26,28 * the whole document * [I] 5,13,20,27 | Examination | WO2016010685 |