EP3126479 - POLYPEPTIDES HAVING ALPHA AMYLASE ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Carsten Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 02 /
DAMAGER, Iben Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 03 /
MUNCH, Astrid Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | NZ EPO Representatives Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 15741896.3 | 01.04.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015EP57183 | Priority number, date | EP20140163062 | 01.04.2014 Original published format: EP 14163062 | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015150457 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3126479 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/386, C12N9/24 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
C11D3/386 (EP,CN,US);
C12N9/2414 (CN,US);
C12N9/2417 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01001 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | POLYPEPTIDE MIT ALPHA-AMYLASE-AKTIVITÄT | [2017/06] | English: | POLYPEPTIDES HAVING ALPHA AMYLASE ACTIVITY | [2017/06] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES PRÉSENTANT UNE ACTIVITÉ ALPHA-AMYLASE | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 24.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 09.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO9623873 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al); | [Y]US6093562 (BISGAARD-FRANTZEN HENRIK [DK], et al); | [XY]WO2013184577 (DANISCO US INC [US]); | by applicant | GB1296839 | GB1483591 | US4106991 | US4435307 | EP0179486 | EP0218272 | US4661452 | EP0238023 | EP0238216 | EP0258068 | EP0305216 | WO8906279 | WO8906270 | EP0331376 | WO8909259 | JPH02238885 | WO9015861 | EP0407225 | WO9201046 | WO9205249 | WO9206204 | EP0495257 | WO9217577 | WO9219709 | WO9219708 | WO9219729 | WO9221760 | EP0531372 | EP0531315 | US5223409 | WO9318140 | WO9324618 | WO9401541 | WO9402597 | WO9407998 | WO9418314 | US5352604 | WO9425612 | WO9425583 | WO9425578 | EP0624154 | US5389536 | WO9506720 | WO9510603 | WO9510602 | WO9514783 | WO9517413 | WO9522625 | WO9522615 | WO9523221 | WO9524471 | US5457046 | WO9527046 | WO9530744 | WO9533836 | WO9535381 | WO9600292 | WO9600787 | WO9611262 | WO9612012 | WO9613580 | WO9623873 | WO9627002 | WO9629397 | WO9634946 | WO9704079 | WO9704102 | WO9707202 | WO9708325 | US5648263 | US5686593 | WO9743424 | US5691178 | WO9808940 | WO9812307 | WO9815257 | WO9817767 | WO9820115 | WO9820116 | US5763254 | US5776757 | WO9901544 | WO9911768 | WO9919467 | WO9943835 | US5977053 | US6011147 | WO0024883 | WO0034450 | EP1025240 | WO0056900 | WO0060060 | WO0060063 | WO0116285 | WO0144452 | WO0162903 | WO0166712 | WO0179459 | WO0179458 | WO0179461 | WO0179460 | WO0192502 | WO0210355 | WO0216547 | WO0226024 | WO0242740 | US6472364 | WO02099091 | WO03006602 | WO03040279 | WO2004003186 | EP1382668 | WO2004041979 | WO2004074419 | WO2005001064 | WO2005003274 | WO2005003275 | WO2005003276 | WO2005040372 | WO2005052161 | WO2005052146 | WO2005056782 | WO2006066594 | EP1705241 | WO2006108856 | WO2006113314 | WO2006130575 | WO2007001262 | WO2007006305 | WO2007044993 | WO2007087258 | WO2007087244 | WO2007087259 | WO2007087242 | WO2007087257 | WO2007087243 | WO2007087508 | US7262042 | WO2007138054 | EP1867708 | EP1876226 | EP1921147 | EP1921148 | WO2008153815 | WO2009000605 | US2009011970 | WO2009004295 | WO2009004294 | WO2009010375 | WO2009015951 | WO2009021867 | WO2009021784 | WO2009021813 | WO2009024780 | WO2009030632 | WO2009040544 | WO2009040545 | WO2009047125 | WO2009047126 | WO2009047127 | WO2009047128 | WO2009050026 | WO2009061380 | WO2009063355 | WO2009067279 | WO2009065770 | WO2009068501 | WO2009072069 | WO2009074398 | WO2009074403 | WO2009087523 | WO2009087033 | WO2009092699 | WO2009095645 | WO2009102854 | WO2009103822 | WO2009109500 | WO2009112296 | WO2009112298 | WO2009117340 | WO2009117341 | WO2009117342 | WO2009115391 | WO2009115392 | WO2009124162 | WO2009124163 | WO2009121757 | WO2009122125 | WO2009121725 | WO2009132870 | WO2009155557 | WO2010000636 | WO2010003783 | WO2010003792 | WO2010014395 | WO2010018043 | WO2010024467 | WO2010024469 | WO2010024470 | WO2010025161 | WO2010030540 | WO2010030541 | WO2010030539 | WO2010033976 | WO2010033746 | WO2010033747 | WO2010033897 | WO2010033979 | WO2010031607 | EP2169040 | WO2010039889 | WO2010044905 | WO2010049187 | WO2010054986 | WO2010057784 | WO2010060821 | WO2010065455 | WO2010063689 | WO2010066486 | WO2010066631 | WO2010066632 | WO2010069742 | WO2010069718 | WO2010069957 | WO2010069905 | WO2010072456 | WO2010072603 | WO2010076292 | WO2010076165 | WO2010078979 | WO2010084039 | WO2010084203 | WO2010090915 | WO2010096673 | WO2010094356 | WO2010100028 | WO2010099997 | WO2010104675 | WO2010102861 | WO2010107560 | WO2010108002 | WO2010108000 | WO2010107635 | WO2010105942 | WO2010105961 | WO2010105962 | WO2010111143 | WO2010111365 | WO2010115813 | WO2010120863 | WO2010118959 | WO2010122051 | WO2010135238 | WO2010142503 | WO2010142539 | WO2010145887 | WO2011005803 | WO2011005623 | WO2011005730 | WO2011005844 | WO2011005904 | WO2011005630 | WO2011005830 | WO2011005912 | WO2011005905 | WO2011005910 | WO2011005813 | WO2011016958 | WO2011025615 | WO2011023716 | WO2011036263 | WO2011036264 | WO2011084412 | WO2011084417 | WO2011084599 | WO2011098531 | WO2011150157 | WO2012137147 | WO2013001078 | WO2013001087 | US2013072416 | US2013072415 | WO2013184577 |