EP3101130 - MUTANT GLUTAMATE-CYSTEINE LIGASE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GAMMA-GLUTAMYL-VALYL-GLYCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAHARA, Ayako c/o AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 02 /
TABUCHI, Eri c/o AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Hideyuki c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION KYOTO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY Goshokaido-cho Matsugasaki, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8585 / JP | 04 /
TAGAMI, Uno c/o AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 05 /
KASHIWAGI, Tatsuki c/o AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 06 /
ITO, Takayuki c/o AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 07 /
NOZAKI, Hiroyuki c/o AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 08 /
SUZUKI, Shunichi c/o AJINOMOTO CO., INC. 1-1 Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2016/49] | Application number, filing date | 15743180.0 | 30.01.2015 | [2016/49] | WO2015JP52741 | Priority number, date | JP20140016601 | 31.01.2014 Original published format: JP 2014016601 | [2016/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015115612 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3101130 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3101130 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N1/21, C12N9/00, C12P21/02 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
C12N9/93 (EP,US);
C07K5/0215 (EP,US);
C12P21/02 (EP,US);
C12Y603/02002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUTANTE GLUTAMAT-CYSTEIN-LIGASE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GAMMA-GLUTAMYL-VALYL-GLYCIN | [2016/49] | English: | MUTANT GLUTAMATE-CYSTEINE LIGASE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING GAMMA-GLUTAMYL-VALYL-GLYCINE | [2016/49] | French: | GLUTAMATE-CYSTÉINE LIGASE MUTANTE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE GAMMA-GLUTAMYL-VALYL-GLYCINE | [2016/49] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2016 | Translation filed | 31.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 14.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2015 | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | GB | 30.01.2021 | IE | 30.01.2021 | LU | 30.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 30.01.2015 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MK | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.01.2015 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MK | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 30.01.2015 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 30.01.2015 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI] - FENG LU ET AL, "A Recalibrated Molecular Clock and Independent Origins for the Cholera Pandemic Clones", PLOS ONE, (20081230), vol. 3, no. 12, ISSN 1932-6203, pages 1 - 11, XP055376318 [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * * page 9, column r, paragraph 5 - page 10, column l, paragraph 1 * [A] 3,4 [I] 5,7-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0004053 | [ ] - UniProt, (20131113), Database accession no. C3LS46 [ ] * abstract * | [XI] - UniProt, (20061031), Database accession no. Q9TY17, XP002770609 [X] 1,2 * abstract * [I] 5,7-15 | [XI] - GeneBank, (19981126), Database accession no. AF095637, XP002770610 [X] 1,2,6,11 * abstract * [I] 5,7-15 | [XI] - CLAIRE M. FRASER ET AL, "DNA sequence of both chromosomes of the cholera pathogen Vibrio cholerae.", NATURE, (20000803), vol. 406, no. 6795, doi:10.1038/35020000, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 477 - 483, XP055083642 [X] 1,2,6 * page 477, column r, paragraph 3 - page 498, column l, paragraph 2 * [I] 5,7-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35020000 | [P] - GenBank, (20140131), Database accession no. AAF93724 [P] * abstract * | [XI] - M. V. OLSON ET AL, "Complete genome sequence of Pseudomonas aeruginosa PAO1, an opportunistic pathogen.", NATURE, (20000821), vol. 406, no. 6799, doi:10.1038/35023079, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 959 - 964, XP055125439 [X] 1,2,6 * page 959, column r, paragraph 3 - page 960, column l, paragraph 3 * [I] 5,7-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35023079 | [ ] - NCBI, (20090426), Database accession no. NP253890 [ ] * abstract * | [XI] - VAN HAM ROELAND C H J ET AL, "Reductive genome evolution in Buchnera aphidicola.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20030121), vol. 100, no. 2, doi:10.1073/pnas.0235981100, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 581 - 586, XP055184259 [X] 1,2,6 * page 581, column r, paragraph 2 * [I] 5,7-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0235981100 | [P] - Protein, (20141217), Database accession no. NP777980, URL: NCBI [P] * abstract * | [XI] - REID L L ET AL, "Molecular cloning and sequencing of the cDNA encoding mouse glutamate-cysteine ligase regulatory subunit", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (19970807), vol. 1353, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 107 - 110, XP002770612 [X] 1,2,6,11-13 * figures 1, 2 * [I] 5,7-15 | [ ] - UniProt, (20140122), Database accession no. O09172 [ ] * abstract * | [A] - SUZUKI H ET AL, Enzymatic synthesis of gamma-glutamylvaline to improve the bitter taste of valine, JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, BOOKS AND JOURNALS DIVISION, PAGE(S) 577 - 580, (20040211), ISSN 0021-8561, XP002735891 [A] 1-15 * page 578, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf0347564 | International search | [A]JP2001321118 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [X]JP2005296005 (FUKUI PREFECTURE); | [A]WO2008126784 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP], et al); | [A]WO2009110624 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP], et al); | [X]JP2012085637 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [X]WO2013054447 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP], et al); | [X] - KELLY BS. ET AL., "Escherichia coli gamma- glutamylcysteine synthetase.Two active site metal ions affect substrate and inhibitor binding", ., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, no. 1, pages 50 - 58, XP055217374 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M107961200 | [X] - KUMAGAI H. ET AL., "y-Glutamylcysteine Synthetase from Proteus mirabilis.", AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., (1982), vol. 46, no. 5, pages 1301 - 1309, XP055217376 | by applicant | JPS57134500 | JPS57183799 | JPS5835197 | JPS58192900 | JPH01191686 | JPH0272876 | JPH02109985 | JPH02207791 | JPH03210184 | JPH057491 | US5185262 | JPH0669386B | JPH0716431B | WO9606926 | JPH08119916 | US5658766 | US5882888 | WO0018935 | US6303383 | US2003148474 | EP0805867 | WO2005010175 | WO2007055388 | WO2007055393 | RU2006134574 | WO2008139945 | WO2008139946 | WO2008139947 | JP4285582B | WO2009107660 | WO2009119554 | WO2010027045 | JP2010161970 | JP2012085637 | WO2013051685 | WO2013054447 | WO2013118544 | - BRENDA S. KELLY ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 50 - 58 | - KUMAGAI, H. ET AL., AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., (1982), vol. 46, pages 1301 - 1309 | - BLATTNER FR ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, pages 1453 - 1462 | - ELIZABETH C. TYLER ET AL., COMPUTERS AND BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 72 - 96 | - BARTON G.J. ET AL., JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1987), vol. 198, no. 2, pages 327 - 337 | - THOMPSON JD ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, no. 22, pages 4673 - 4680 | - HIGUCHI, R., PCR Technology, STOCKTON PRESS, (1989), vol. 61 | - CARTER P., METH., IN ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 154, page 382 | - KRAMER, W.; FRITS, H.J., METH. IN ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 154, page 350 | - KUNKEL, T.A. ET AL., METH. IN ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 154, page 367 | - APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 53, pages 674 - 679 | - JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 104, pages 311 - 323 | - APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (200512), vol. 71, no. 12, pages 8587 - 8596 | - GOLDSTEIN ET AL., "Prokaryotic Promoters in Biotechnology", BIOTECHNOL. ANNU. REV., (1995), vol. 1, pages 105 - 128 | - AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 48, pages 2901 - 2903 | - "Genetic Engineering", Fundamental Microbiology, KYORITSU SHUPPAN CO., LTD, (1987), vol. 8 | - DATSENKO, K.A.; WANNER, B.L., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 6640 - 6645 | - MANDEL, M.; HIGA, A., J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 53, pages 159 - 162 | - DUNCAN, C.H.; WILSON, G.A.; YOUNG, F.E., GENE, (1977), vol. 1, pages 153 - 167 | - CHANG, S.; CHOEN, S.N., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1979), vol. 168, pages 111 - 115 | - BIBB, M.J.; WARD, J.M.; HOPWOOD, O.A., NATURE, (1978), vol. 274, pages 398 - 400 | - HINNEN, A.; HICKS, J.B.; FINK, G.R., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1978), vol. 75, pages 1929 - 1933 | - DATSENKO, K.A; WANNER, B.L., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 6640 - 6645 | - CHO, E.H.; GUMPORT, R.I.; GARDNER, J.F., J. BACTERIOL., (2002), vol. 184, pages 5200 - 5203 | - HEERMANN, R ET AL., MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, (2008), vol. 7, page 14 | - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 272, pages 8611 - 8617 | - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 5511 - 5515 | - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 26, no. 116, pages 20833 - 20839 | - HORI, H. ET AL., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 48, no. 6, pages 693 - 698 | - YAMAMOTO, S ET AL., BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (2005), vol. 69, no. 4, pages 784 - 789 | - C. AUG'E; CH. GAUTHERON, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1988), vol. 29, pages 789 - 790 | - MURATA, K. ET AL., AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 52, no. 6, pages 1471 - 1477 | - Amino Acid Fermentation, GAKKAI SHUPPAN CENTER LTD., (19860530), pages 77 - 100 | - SUZUKI, H. ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (2005), vol. 187, pages 5861 - 5867 |