EP3099411 - SINGLE-CELL PIPETTE ASSEMBLY COMPRISING SINGLE-CELL PIPETTE HANDLE AND SINGLE-CELL PIPETTE TIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Methodist Hospital 6565 Fannin Street, MS D200 Houston, Texas 77030 / US | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIN, Lidong 3215 Blue Bonnet Blvd. Houston, TX 77025 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Kai 3507 Rose Water Drive Manvel, TX 77578 / US | [2017/17] |
Former [2016/49] | 01 /
QIN, Lidong 3215 Blue Bonnet Blvd. Houston, TX 77025 / US | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Kai 2250 Holly Hall St. Apt. 3157 Houston, TX 77054 / US | Representative(s) | Küchler, Stefan Stefan T. Küchler Patentanwalt Färberstraße 20 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Küchler, Stefan Patentanwalt Färberstrasse 20 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 15743612.2 | 28.01.2015 | [2016/49] | WO2015US13343 | Priority number, date | US201461932493P | 28.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461932493 P | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015116714 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3099411 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
B01L3/0275 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0657 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0668 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0832 (US);
B01L2400/086 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Title | German: | EINZELLIGE PIPETTENANORDNUNG MIT EINZELLIGEM PIPETTENGRIFF UND EINZELLIGER PIPETTENSPITZE | [2016/49] | English: | SINGLE-CELL PIPETTE ASSEMBLY COMPRISING SINGLE-CELL PIPETTE HANDLE AND SINGLE-CELL PIPETTE TIP | [2016/49] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE PIPETTE À CELLULE UNIQUE COMPRENANT UNE POIGNÉE DE PIPETTE À CELLULE UNIQUE ET UNE POINTE DE PIPETTE À CELLULE UNIQUE | [2016/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 26.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 09.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - KAI ZHANG ET AL, "Hand-Held and Integrated Single-Cell Pipettes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20140806), vol. 136, no. 31, doi:10.1021/ja5053279, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 10858 - 10861, XP055397637 [XP] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja5053279 | International search | [A]US2011268628 (WARHURST JULIAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2012019270 (AMODEI DARIO G [US], et al); | [Y]US2012264134 (IONESCU-ZANETTI CRISTIAN [US], et al); | [A]US2013078163 (CHUNG KWANGHUN [US], et al) |