EP3100097 - DYNAMIC LENS FOR HEAD MOUNTED DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2016/49] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRESS, Bernard C. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
PRIEST-DORMAN, Greg E. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kurfürstendamm 54-55 10707 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Anderson, Oliver Ben Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15743961.3 | 07.01.2015 | [2016/49] | WO2015US10507 | Priority number, date | US201414167851 | 29.01.2014 Original published format: US201414167851 | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015116359 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3100097 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
G02B27/0172 (EP,US);
G02B26/0808 (EP,US);
G02B3/14 (EP,US);
G02F1/29 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0123 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0127 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0141 (US);
G02B2027/0178 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0185 (EP,US);
G02B27/0103 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE LINSE FÜR EINE KOPFMONTIERTE ANZEIGE | [2016/49] | English: | DYNAMIC LENS FOR HEAD MOUNTED DISPLAY | [2016/49] | French: | LENTILLE DYNAMIQUE POUR VISIOCASQUE | [2016/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 22.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/37] | 10.08.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.09.2022 | 15.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP19163170.4 / EP3528033 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011075257 (HUA HONG [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8 * paragraphs [0085] - [0116]; figures 1,2,9,10,27-29 * [I] 3 | International search | [Y]US2013033756 (SPITZER MARK B [US], et al); | [Y]US2004164927 (SUYAMA SHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2013314793 (ROBBINS STEVEN JOHN [US], et al); | [A]KR101143558B (DONGWOON ANATECH CO., LTD.); | [A]US2007195409 (YUN HAE-YOUNG [KR], et al) |