EP3160411 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSFERRING A DISCRETE SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWKA, Paul Anthony One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 02 /
WALSH, Bradley Edwards One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Mather, Peter Geoffrey Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Mather, Peter Geoffrey Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 15744398.7 | 23.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015US37113 | Priority number, date | US201462017293P | 26.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462017293 P | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015200279 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3160411 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
A61F13/15764 (EP,US);
B65G37/00 (US);
B65G43/08 (US);
B65G51/035 (US);
B65G2811/0673 (US);
B65G2812/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN EINES EINZELSUBSTRATS | [2017/18] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSFERRING A DISCRETE SUBSTRATE | [2017/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSFERT DE SUBSTRAT DISCRET | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 16.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 01.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2491906 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0012] - [0013]; figure 6 *; | [A]US2014110052 (FINDLEY DANIEL PATRICK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0092] - [0099]; figure 4 * | by applicant | US5628097 | US5916661 | US6545197 | US6107539 | US4610678 | US4673402 | US4888231 | US4834735 | US5599335 | US5562646 | US5669894 | US6790798 | US2004158212 | US2004097895 | US3860003 | US4909803 | US4695278 | US4795454 | US4704115 | US2009312730 | US2013255865 | US3848594 | US4662875 | US4846815 | US4894060 | US4946527 | US5151092 | US5221274 | US7569039 | US2005107764 | US2012061016 | US2012061015 | US2013255861 | US2013255862 | US2013255863 | US2013255864 |