EP3174655 - CAMERA-BASED DETERMINING OF ROUGHNESS FOR ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURED COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESS, Thomas Boosstrasse 14 81541 München / DE | 02 /
SCHLICK, Georg Hamburgerstrasse 24 80809 München / DE | 03 /
LADEWIG, Alexander Finner 6 83707 Bad Wiessee / DE | [2017/23] | Application number, filing date | 15744471.2 | 20.05.2015 | [2017/23] | WO2015DE00261 | Priority number, date | DE201410214939 | 30.07.2014 Original published format: DE102014214939 | [2017/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016015695 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3174655 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/105, B29C67/00 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F10/38 (EP,US);
B22F12/90 (EP,US);
B29C64/393 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Title | German: | KAMERABASIERTE RAUHEITSBESTIMMUNG FÜR GENERATIV HERGESTELLTE BAUTEILE | [2017/23] | English: | CAMERA-BASED DETERMINING OF ROUGHNESS FOR ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURED COMPONENTS | [2017/23] | French: | DÉTERMINATION AU MOYEN D'UNE CAMÉRA DE LA RUGOSITÉ DE COMPOSANTS FABRIQUÉS DE MANIÈRE GÉNÉRATIVE | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 24.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/14] | 15.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2004133298 (TOYSERKANI EHSAN [CA], et al) [X] 10-13 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0036] - [0061] * * figure 1 * [I] 1-9; | [XPI]WO2015010855 (EOS ELECTRO OPTICAL SYST [DE]) [XP] 1-3,7,8 * page 3 - page 10 *[I] 4-6,9-13 | by applicant | DE102010050531 | WO2012100766 |