EP3157567 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A BETA-2-AGONIST AND ANTICHOLINERGIC AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cipla Limited Cipla House Peninsula Business Park Ganpatrao Kadam Marg Lower Parel Mumbai 400 013 / IN | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALHOTRA, Geena 3403 Springs, Island City Centre Next to Wadala Telephone Exchange G. D Ambekar Marg, Dadar (East) Mumbai Maharashtra 400014 / IN | 02 /
RAUT, Preeti B-7 Anant Apartments Tejpal Scheme Road 5 Vile Parle (East) Mumbai Maharashtra 400 057 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2017/17] | 01 /
MALHOTRA, Geena 4 Anderson House Opposite Mazgaon Post Office Mazgaon Mumbai Maharashtra 400 010 / IN | ||
02 /
RAUT, Preeti B-7 Anant Apartments Tejpal Scheme Road 5 Vile Parle (East) Mumbai Maharashtra 400 057 / IN | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/17] | Turner, Craig Robert A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15744624.6 | 18.06.2015 | [2017/17] | WO2015GB00189 | Priority number, date | IN2014MUM1969 | 18.06.2014 Original published format: IN 1969MU2014 | [2017/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015193631 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3157567 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/439, A61K31/46, A61K31/4704, A61P11/08, A61K31/275, A61K31/522, A61K31/56, A61K31/573, A61K31/58 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/439 (EP,US);
A61K31/275 (EP,US);
A61K31/46 (EP,US);
A61K31/4704 (EP,US);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K31/56 (EP,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/275, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/439, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/46, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4704, A61K31/439, A61K2300/00, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/522, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/56, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Validation states | MA | 21.12.2016 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM BETA-2-AGONISTEN UND EINEM ANTICHOLINERGIKUM | [2017/17] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A BETA-2-AGONIST AND ANTICHOLINERGIC AGENT | [2017/17] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT UN BÊTA-2 AGONISTE ET UN AGENT ANTICHOLINERGIQUE | [2017/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 21.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 28.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.2017 | 30.06.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2018 | 30.06.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2009036243 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8,10,12-14,16-30 * page 18, line 21 - page 19, line 9; claims 1-4,28,33,45 *; | [X]WO2011067212 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,12-14,16-30 * page 32, paragraph 2; claims 56,60,66 *; | [X]EP2668941 (ALMIRALL SA [ES]) [X] 1,2,11-30 * claims 1,17,18 *; | [XP]WO2014095924 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) [XP] 1-3,5,7,9,12-14,17-30* page 11, lines 15-17; claims 3,4 *; | [Y] - M. CAZZOLA ET AL, "Long-acting bronchodilators in COPD: where are we now and where are we going?", BREATHE, (20140601), vol. 10, no. 2, doi:10.1183/20734735.014813, ISSN 1810-6838, pages 110 - 120, XP055134705 [Y] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1183/20734735.014813 | [Y] - CAZZOLA M ET AL, "The scientific rationale for combining long-acting beta2-agonists and muscarinic antagonists in COPD", PULMORNARY PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, GB, vol. 23, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.PUPT.2010.03.003, ISSN 1094-5539, (20100801), pages 257 - 267, (20100408), XP027474949 [Y] 1-30 * page 264, column 1, paragraph 5 - page 265, column 1, paragraph 1; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pupt.2010.03.003 | Examination | - Mario Malerba ET AL, "Therapeutic potential for novel ultra long-acting β2-agonists in the management of COPD: biological and pharmacological aspects", Drug Discovery Today, (20120501), vol. 17, no. 9-10, doi:10.1016/j.drudis.2011.11.002, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 496 - 504, XP055042135 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.drudis.2011.11.002 | - M Decramer ET AL, "Dose-related efficacy of GSK573719, a new long-acting muscarinic receptor antagonist (LAMA) offering sustained 24-hour bronchodilation, in COPD", (20110101), page 1, URL: https://erj.ersjournals.com/content/38/Suppl_55/p878, (20190515), XP055588792 | - M. Cazzola ET AL, "Pharmacology and Therapeutics of Bronchodilators", Pharmacological Reviews, (20120518), vol. 64, no. 3, doi:10.1124/pr.111.004580, pages 450 - 504, XP055083801 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/pr.111.004580 | - Eric Bateman ET AL, "Efficacy and safety of the long-acting muscarinic antagonist GSK233705 delivered once daily in patients with COPD : Efficacy and safety of GSK233705 in COPD", The Clinical Respiratory Journal, (20120213), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1111/j.1752-699X.2011.00278.x, ISSN 1752-6981, pages 248 - 257, XP055588856 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1752-699X.2011.00278.x | by applicant | WO2009036243 | WO2011067212 | WO2012168160 | WO2012168161 | WO2013153146 | WO2013178742 | WO2014095924 | WO2014140648 | WO2015015446 |