EP3102617 - AMORPHOUS PROPYLENE-ETHYLENE COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, RO | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthomer Adhesive Technologies LLC 25435 Harvard Road Beachwood, Ohio 44122 / US | [2022/26] |
Former [2016/50] | For all designated states Eastman Chemical Company 200 South Wilcox Drive Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOMERS, Marc Stacey 4552 Cardinal Lane Longview, TX 75605-6413 / US | 02 /
NOVAK, Bennett H. 903 Rose Mount Drive Longview, TX 75601 / US | 03 /
RAJESHRAJA, Puthenkovilakom 619 Rollingbrook St Apt 2201 Baytown TX 77521-4080 / US | 04 /
COTTLE, Raymond Prescott 1112 Stillmeadow Lane Longview, TX 75604 / US | [2023/45] |
Former [2016/50] | 01 /
SOMERS, Marc, Stacey 4552 Cardinal Lane Longview, TX 75605-6413 / US | ||
02 /
NOVAK, Bennett, H. 903 Rose Drive Longview, TX 75601 / US | |||
03 /
RAJESHRAJA, Puthenkovilakom 619 Rollingbrook St Apt 2201 Baytown TX 77521-4080 / US | |||
04 /
COTTLE, Raymond, Prescott 1112 Stillmeadow Lane Longview, TX 75604 / US | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/45] | Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/50] | Best, Michael, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15745956.1 | 16.01.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015US11689 | Priority number, date | US201461937024P | 07.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461937024 P | US201414567037 | 11.12.2014 Original published format: US201414567037 | US201414567050 | 11.12.2014 Original published format: US201414567050 | US201414567093 | 11.12.2014 Original published format: US201414567093 | US201414567028 | 11.12.2014 Original published format: US201414567028 | US201414567074 | 11.12.2014 Original published format: US201414567074 | [2016/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015119758 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3102617 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3102617 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/06, C09J123/10, C08L23/10, C09J123/14, C09J11/06, C08K5/134, C08K5/01, C08L23/16, C09J123/16, C08L53/02 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
C09J123/14 (EP,US);
G03G15/2053 (US);
C08F10/06 (US);
C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08K11/00 (US);
C08K5/01 (US);
C08K5/134 (US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/06, C08F4/6465 (US,EP);
C08F210/06, C08F4/6543 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L53/02 (US,EP);
C09J123/10, C08L53/02 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2017/38] | C08F210/06, C09J123/16, C08L23/16, C08K5/01, C08K5/134, C09J11/06, C09J123/14, C08L23/10, C09J123/10 | ||
Former IPC [2016/50] | C08F210/06, C09J123/16, C08L23/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMORPHE PROPYLEN-ETHYLEN-COPOLYMERE | [2016/50] | English: | AMORPHOUS PROPYLENE-ETHYLENE COPOLYMERS | [2016/50] | French: | COPOLYMÈRES AMORPHES DE PROPYLÈNE-ÉTHYLÈNE | [2016/50] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 18.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.07.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 05.07.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.07.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.06.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 21.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.07.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 04.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 04.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SE | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SE | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2004052952 (VEY MARLIES [DE], et al); | [XI]US2010285246 (BECKER HINNERK GORDON [DE], et al); | [XI]US2011060078 (BECKER HINNERK GORDON [DE], et al); | [XI]US8536268 (KARJALA TERESA P [US], et al) | International search | [Y]CA1282546 (EL PASO PRODUCTS CO [US]); | [A]US5733645 (SOMERS MARC STACEY [US]); | [A]US6586536 (KELLEY JOSEPH M [US]); | [Y]US2004127614 (JIANG PEIJUN [US], et al); | [A]US2008021186 (STEIB CHRISTIAN [DE]); | [Y]WO2013019507 (HENKEL CORP [US], et al); | [XY]US8536268 (KARJALA TERESA P [US], et al) | Examination | US2010279033 | US2011003094 |