EP3102613 - POLYMER PARTICLES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polybatics Limited 21 Dairy Farm Road Palmerston North 4474 / NZ | [2020/35] |
Former [2020/27] | For all designated states Rehm, Bernd Helmut Adam Dairy Farm Road Palmerston North 4474 / NZ | ||
For all designated states Polybatics Limited 21 Dairy Farm Road Palmerston North 4474 / NZ | |||
Former [2016/50] | For all designated states Rehm, Bernd Helmut Adam Dairy Farm Road Palmerston North 4474 / NZ | ||
For all designated states Buddle, Bryce Malcolm Dairy Farm Road Palmerston North 4474 / NZ | |||
For all designated states Wedlock, David Neil Dary Farm Road Palmerston North 4474 / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REHM, Bernd Helmut Adam c/o Polybatics Limited 21 Dairy Farm Road Palmerston North 4474 / NZ | [2020/35] |
Former [2016/50] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2021/23] |
Former [2016/50] | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15746012.2 | 04.02.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015NZ50008 | Priority number, date | NZ20140620682 | 04.02.2014 Original published format: NZ 62068214 | [2016/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015119512 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3102613 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3102613 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 13.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K19/00, A61K38/43, A61P31/06, A61K39/04 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
C07K14/35 (EP,US);
A61K38/44 (EP,US);
A61K38/45 (EP,US);
A61K38/51 (EP,US);
A61K39/04 (EP,US);
A61K49/0006 (US);
A61P31/06 (EP);
C12N9/1025 (EP,US);
G01N33/6866 (US);
G01N33/6893 (US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
G01N2333/35 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Extension states | BA | 02.09.2016 | ME | 02.09.2016 | Title | German: | POLYMERPARTIKEL UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2016/50] | English: | POLYMER PARTICLES AND USES THEREOF | [2016/50] | French: | PARTICULES DE POLYMÈRE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2016/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 02.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 05.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.10.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 05.10.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.10.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.06.2021 | PT | 04.02.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/36] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
Former [2022/26] | AL | 09.06.2021 | |
PT | 11.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | PT | 11.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002176867 (ANDERSEN PETER [DK], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2014009439 (NEC EUROPE LTD [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 18 *; | [Y] - JIA MING LIN ET AL, "Fusion Expression on the Esat-6 and cfp-10 Genes of Mycobacterium bovis in Escherichia coli", APPLIED MECHANICS AND MATERIALS, CH, (20130901), vol. 421, doi:10.4028/www.scientific.net/AMM.421.354, ISSN 1660-9336, pages 354 - 358, XP055424170 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4028/www.scientific.net/AMM.421.354 | International search | [A]US5965140 (VALENZUELA PABLO D T [US], et al); | [A]US2006024332 (WATERS WADE R [US], et al); | [A]WO2007037706 (REHM BERND HELMUT ADAM [NZ], et al); | [A]WO2011013097 (REHM BERND HELMUT ADAM [NZ], et al); | [A]WO2012104791 (REHM BERND HELMUT ADAM [NZ], et al); | [XP] - CHEN, S. ET AL., "New Skin Test for Detection of Bovine Tuberculosis on the Basis of Antigen-Displaying Polyester Inclusions Produced by Recombinant Escherichia coli", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20140415), vol. 80, no. 8, pages 2526 - 2535, XP055216252 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.04168-13 |