EP3103263 - DIGITAL MEDIA CONTENT AND ASSOCIATED USER POOL APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Music Media Limited 42-50 Hersham Road Walton-On-Thames Surrey KT12 1RZ / GB | [2017/14] |
Former [2016/50] | For all designated states Crowdmix Ltd 7 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEAN, Andy 99 Gloucester Avenue London NW1 8LB / GB | 02 /
WOLFF, Ben 24 Boss Street Boss House London SE1 2PS / GB | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Noble, Nicholas Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Noble, Nicholas Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15746297.9 | 04.02.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015CN72262 | Priority number, date | GB20140002190 | 07.02.2014 Original published format: GB 201402190 | [2016/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015117556 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3103263 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/262 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
G06F16/637 (EP,GB,US);
G06F16/40 (GB);
G06F16/435 (EP,US);
G06F16/438 (EP,US);
G06F16/638 (EP,US);
G06F16/639 (EP,GB,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIGITALER MEDIENINHALTE UND ZUGEHÖRIGE BENUTZERPOOLVORRICHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN | [2016/50] | English: | DIGITAL MEDIA CONTENT AND ASSOCIATED USER POOL APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2016/50] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE GROUPE DE CONTENUS MULTIMÉDIAS NUMÉRIQUES ET D'UTILISATEURS ASSOCIÉS | [2016/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 07.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2017 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 10.11.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/09] | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 07.09.2016 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2016/51] | 01.03.2017 | Resumption of proceedings | [2017/04] | 07.09.2016 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2017/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009077499 (SVENDSEN HUGH [US], et al) [A] 1-45* paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0007] *; | [X]US2009164516 (SVENDSEN HUGH [US], et al) [X] 1-45 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0054] *; | [A]US2010198767 (FARRELLY EUGENE MATTHEW [US]) [A] 1-45 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0062] *; | [A]WO2014002004 (BATCHU SUMANA KRISHNAIAHSETTY [IN]) [A] 1,22 * page 5 - page 8 *; | [X]US2014040416 (KIDRON ADAM [US]) [X] 1-45 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0098] * | International search | [A]CN101416185 (STRANDS INC [US]) [A] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101464881 (CONCERT TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [A] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101681290 (MICROSOFT CORP) [A] 1-45 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012210351 (NUKALA CHANDRASEKHAR [US], et al) [A] 1-45 * description, page 4, paragraph[0034] to page 8, paragraph[0059] , figure 2 *; | [A]US2013047084 (SANDERS CHRISTOPHER JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-45* the whole document * |