EP3104376 - RESIN COMPOSITION FOR TEMPERATURE SENSOR, ELEMENT FOR TEMPERATURE SENSOR, TEMPERATURE SENSOR, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ELEMENT FOR TEMPERATURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Hon-cho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKITANI, Tsuyoshi c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8656 / JP | 02 /
TERAKAWA, Yuki c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8656 / JP | 03 /
YOKOTA, Tomoyuki c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8656 / JP | 04 /
SOMEYA, Takao c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8656 / JP | 05 /
REEDER, Jonathan T c/o The University of Tokyo 3-1, Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8656 / JP | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15746736.6 | 05.02.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015JP53272 | Priority number, date | JP20140021767 | 06.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014021767 | [2016/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015119205 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3104376 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01C7/02, C08K3/04, C08L33/08, H01C17/06 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
C09D7/61 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/18 (KR);
C08F220/1804 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/1818 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/04 (US);
C08K3/042 (KR);
C08L33/08 (EP,KR,US);
C09D133/08 (KR,US);
C09D5/24 (KR,US);
G01K7/22 (KR,US);
H01C17/06 (US);
H01C17/06586 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR TEMPERATURSENSOR, ELEMENT FÜR TEMPERATURSENSOR, TEMPERATURSENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEMENTS FÜR TEMPERATURSENSOR | [2016/50] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION FOR TEMPERATURE SENSOR, ELEMENT FOR TEMPERATURE SENSOR, TEMPERATURE SENSOR, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ELEMENT FOR TEMPERATURE SENSOR | [2016/50] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE POUR CAPTEUR DE TEMPÉRATURE, ÉLÉMENT POUR CAPTEUR DE TEMPÉRATURE AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI, ET CAPTEUR DE TEMPÉRATURE | [2016/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2016 | Translation filed | 02.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 02.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/04] | 22.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11176614 (OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 7* abstract *; | [Y]JP2006013378 (TDK CORP) [Y] 5-11 * abstract *; | [XY]DE102011080729 (TESA SE [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0045] * [Y] 5-11 | International search | [A]JPH11176614 (OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0015] to [0035]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000049004 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 10* , paragraphs [0015] to [0018]; fig. 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005082717 (QIMEI IND CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0001], [0027] to [0030] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006013378 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0002], [0016] to [0019], [0043] to [0066]; fig. 1 & US 2006/0022790 A1 & EP 1612811 A1 & DE 602005004703 D & KR 10-2006-0048688 A & CN 1715329 A & TW 001295307 B *; | [A]WO2010110331 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 6, 7 * , paragraphs [0001], [0077] to [0079] & JP 5626204 B *; | [A]US2013070380 (WANG DAVID SHAU CHEW [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0020] to [0029]; fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) * |