EP3103486 - PREPARATION FOR ADHESION PREVENTION COMPRISING COMPOSITION OF POLYCATIONIC TRIBLOCK COPOLYMER AND POLYANIONIC POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Tsukuba 1-1-1, Tennodai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8577 / JP | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGASAKI, Yukio c/o University of Tsukuba 1-1-1 Tennodai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8577 / JP | 02 /
NAKAGAWA, Hiroyuki c/o University of Tsukuba 1-1-1 Tennodai Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8577 / JP | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2016/50] | Application number, filing date | 15747041.0 | 27.01.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015JP52146 | Priority number, date | JP20140020211 | 05.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014020211 | JP20140166730 | 19.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014166730 | [2016/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015118993 | Date: | 13.08.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3103486 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/00, C08F293/00, C08L53/00, A61K31/74, A61P41/00 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
A61L31/041 (EP,US);
A61K31/74 (EP);
A61K49/0004 (US);
A61L31/145 (EP,US);
A61P41/00 (EP);
C08F283/06 (US);
C08L33/02 (US);
C08L5/08 (US);
C08L51/08 (US);
C08L2203/02 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/041, C08L33/08 (US,EP);
A61L31/041, C08L5/08 (US,EP);
A61L31/041, C08L71/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/50] | A61L31/00, C08F293/00, C08L53/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNG ZUR ADHÄSIONSVERHINDERUNG MIT EINER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS EINEM POLYKATIONISCHEN TRIBLOCK-COPOLYMER UND POLYANIONISCHEN POLYMER | [2016/50] | English: | PREPARATION FOR ADHESION PREVENTION COMPRISING COMPOSITION OF POLYCATIONIC TRIBLOCK COPOLYMER AND POLYANIONIC POLYMER | [2016/50] | French: | PRÉPARATION ANTI-ADHÉRENTE COMPRENANT UNE COMPOSITION À BASE D'UN COPOLYMÈRE POLYCATIONIQUE TRIBLOC ET D'UN POLYMÈRE POLYANIONIQUE | [2016/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2016 | Translation filed | 25.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 25.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 25.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02102864 (COHESION TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * claims 1,74-84 *; | [A]WO2007124132 (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 42, paragraph 4; claim 1 *; | [XP]EP2808349 (UNIV TSUKUBA [JP]) [XP] 1,10,17-19 * claims 4,5,7-12 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] *; | [E]EP3009140 (UNIV TSUKUBA [JP]) [E] 1,2,10,17-19 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0029] , [0033] , [0038]; examples 1,3,5-7 ** claim 5 * | International search | [Y]WO9220746 (HYBRITECH INC [US]) [Y] 12-16 * , claims; examples 1, 2 & AU 1929292 A *; | [Y]JP2000116765 (KURARAY CO) [Y] 1-10, 16 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0001], [0002] (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2009133647 (UNIV TSUKUBA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10, 12-19 * , entire text & US 2011/0142787 A1 & CA 2723118 A *; | [Y]WO2013111801 (UNIV TSUKUBA [JP]) [Y] 1-10, 12-16 * , claims 7 to 13 & US 2014/0356315 A1 & EP 2808349 A1 *; | [PX]WO2014199982 (UNIV TSUKUBA [JP]) [PX] 17-19* , claims; paragraph [0007]; preparation examples 15 to 18 (Family: none) * |