EP3171733 - METHOD TO MEASURE AND/OR ADJUST COMBING RESISTANCE BY USING A BRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORENZI, Marc Paul 70 Biopolis Street Singapore 138547 / SG | 02 /
ARIF, Hassan 70 Biopolis Street Singapore 138547 / SG | 03 /
PAN, Guohua 70 Biopolis Street Singapore 138547 / SG | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department PO Box 14 Frankfurter Straße 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 15747894.2 | 23.07.2015 | [2017/22] | WO2015US41643 | Priority number, date | US201462028319P | 24.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462028319 P | [2017/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016014735 | Date: | 28.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3171733 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/10 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
A46B9/10 (EP,CN,US);
A46B5/002 (CN,US);
A46B9/023 (CN,US);
A46B17/04 (CN,US);
A46B2200/104 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN UND/ODER EINSTELLEN DES KÄMMWIDERSTANDES MITTELS EINER BÜRSTE | [2017/22] | English: | METHOD TO MEASURE AND/OR ADJUST COMBING RESISTANCE BY USING A BRUSH | [2017/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE ET/OU DE RÉGLAGE DE LA RÉSISTANCE DE PEIGNAGE À L'AIDE D'UNE BROSSE | [2017/22] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 05.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5185902 (FONG JAMES C [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [I]US6308717 (VRTARIC JOHN [US]) [I] 1,3-16 * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 51 * * abstract *; | [A]US6477732 (CLINE KEVIN W [US], et al) [A] 1* figure - *; | [I]US2004250831 (RIZZUTO LEANDRO [US]) [I] 1,3-16 * abstract * | by applicant | US2003233861 | US2010049671 |