Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3171733
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
01.06.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
26.02.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.09.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
29.09.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
05.09.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.04.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
28.04.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
28.04.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
18.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
06.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|