Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016022022 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514808324 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028319 | 24.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017525430 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41643 | 23.07.2015 | US201462028319 | 24.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106535707 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41643 | 23.07.2015 | US201462028319 | 24.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3171733 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41643 | 23.07.2015 | US201462028319 | 24.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016014735 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028319 | 24.07.2014 |