Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016201159 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858390 | 18.09.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016201158 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858367 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016201157 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858357 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016201156 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858300 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016200440 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514968279 | 14.12.2015 | US201514968177 | 14.12.2015 | US201514968248 | 14.12.2015 | US201514968215 | 14.12.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015191831 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2016 | A3 | WO2015191831 | 17.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462011857 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015191830 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2016 | A3 | WO2015191830 | 17.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462011852 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015191829 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2016 | A3 | WO2015191829 | 17.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462011846 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015191824 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2016 | A3 | WO2015191824 | 17.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462011842 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015191823 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2016 | A3 | WO2015191823 | 17.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462011828 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015191821 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2016 | A3 | WO2015191821 | 17.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462011823 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE49230E | Global Dossier | 04.10.2022 | E | Priority number | Date | US202016869586 | 07.05.2020 | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858390 | 18.09.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021345758 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US202117381487 | 21.07.2021 | US201514858357 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021345757 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US202117381472 | 21.07.2021 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858357 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021330948 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US202117370260 | 08.07.2021 | US201462028935 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9907734 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2018 | B2 | US2017056303 | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615349073 | 11.11.2016 | US201462011857 | 13.06.2014 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9962532 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2018 | B2 | US2016361526 | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858390 | 18.09.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016361240 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858300 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9949547 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2018 | B2 | US2016360854 | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858367 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016114349 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462011846 | 13.06.2014 | US201514968215 | 14.12.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016096192 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514968177 | 14.12.2015 | US201462011846 | 13.06.2014 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9955769 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2018 | B2 | US2016022011 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028951 | 25.07.2014 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016022009 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201462028944 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9949552 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2018 | B2 | US2016022008 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201462028937 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9928591 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2018 | B2 | US2015360017 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011842 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9924875 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2018 | B2 | US2015360016 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011828 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9925362 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2018 | B2 | US2015360015 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011823 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015359714 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462011852 | 13.06.2014 | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9522101 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2016 | B2 | US2015359712 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462011857 | 13.06.2014 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11701681 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2023 | B2 | US2021094061 | 01.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017121826 | 15.12.2020 | US201462011846 | 13.06.2014 | US201514968215 | 14.12.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11116302 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2021 | B2 | US2016360858 | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858357 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11083880 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2021 | B2 | US2016022972 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201462028935 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10518291 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2019 | B2 | US2016101434 | 14.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462011846 | 13.06.2014 | US201514968248 | 14.12.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10314378 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2019 | B2 | US2016022006 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201462028929 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10238582 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2019 | B2 | US2018000697 | 04.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201715704541 | 14.09.2017 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858300 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10188193 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2019 | B2 | US2016022010 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201462028948 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10188192 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2019 | B2 | US2015359315 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462011846 | 13.06.2014 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10156036 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2018 | B2 | US2016102424 | 14.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514968279 | 14.12.2015 | US201462011846 | 13.06.2014 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170023137 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41880 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028944 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170023135 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028929 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41887 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170020912 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028951 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41882 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170020911 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028937 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41889 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170002615 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35290 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011852 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102134130B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2020 | B1 | KR20170023138 | 02.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41881 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028948 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102040452B | Global Dossier | 04.11.2019 | B1 | KR20190037356 | 05.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35291 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011857 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101988846B | Global Dossier | 13.06.2019 | B1 | KR20170002616 | 06.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35291 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011857 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101964028B | Global Dossier | 29.03.2019 | B1 | KR20180135126 | 19.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028951 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41882 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101962605B | Global Dossier | 28.03.2019 | B1 | KR20180133946 | 17.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028937 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41889 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101942671B | Global Dossier | 11.04.2019 | B1 | KR20170023136 | 02.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41888 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028935 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101920548B | Global Dossier | 20.11.2018 | B1 | KR20170005082 | 11.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462011823 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35276 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101915375B | Global Dossier | 05.11.2018 | B1 | KR20170002617 | 06.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35279 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011842 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101904709B | Global Dossier | 08.10.2018 | B1 | KR20170003985 | 10.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462011846 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35288 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101881739B | Global Dossier | 25.07.2018 | B1 | KR20170005465 | 13.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462011828 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35278 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021184802 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028937 | 25.07.2014 | JP2019082801 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2020114455 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858357 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6748119B | Global Dossier | 26.08.2020 | B2 | JP2018529395 | 11.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858390 | 18.09.2015 | WO2016US36783 | 10.06.2016 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7078399B | Global Dossier | 31.05.2022 | B2 | JP2018527960 | 27.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | WO2016US36782 | 10.06.2016 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858367 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6748118B | Global Dossier | 26.08.2020 | B2 | JP2018522626 | 16.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | WO2016US36781 | 10.06.2016 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858357 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6878314B | Global Dossier | 26.05.2021 | B2 | JP2018520853 | 02.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514968279 | 14.12.2015 | US201514968177 | 14.12.2015 | US201514968248 | 14.12.2015 | US201514968215 | 14.12.2015 | WO2016US12425 | 07.01.2016 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6462110B | Global Dossier | 30.01.2019 | B2 | JP2017534307 | 24.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41881 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028948 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017534306 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41880 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028944 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6796493B | Global Dossier | 09.12.2020 | B2 | JP2017529515 | 05.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462011828 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35278 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017529319 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028951 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41882 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017529122 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028929 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41887 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017529121 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41888 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028935 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017528180 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028937 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41889 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017526617 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35290 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011852 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6374991B | Global Dossier | 15.08.2018 | B2 | JP2017526396 | 14.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35291 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011857 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6633001B | Global Dossier | 22.01.2020 | B2 | JP2017525657 | 07.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35279 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011842 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6374990B | Global Dossier | 15.08.2018 | B2 | JP2017524403 | 31.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462011823 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35276 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6374992B | Global Dossier | 15.08.2018 | B2 | JP2017521130 | 03.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462011846 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35288 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3307351 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2021 | B1 | EP3307351 | 18.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US36780 | 10.06.2016 | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858300 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3307140 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | WO2016US36781 | 10.06.2016 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858357 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3307131 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858390 | 18.09.2015 | WO2016US36783 | 10.06.2016 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3307130 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | WO2016US36782 | 10.06.2016 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858367 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3307129 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514968279 | 14.12.2015 | US201514968177 | 14.12.2015 | US201514968248 | 14.12.2015 | US201514968215 | 14.12.2015 | WO2016US12425 | 07.01.2016 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3171762 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2020 | B1 | EP3171762 | 31.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028937 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41889 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3171760 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028951 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41882 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3171759 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41881 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028948 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3171757 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028929 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41887 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3171731 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2022 | B1 | EP3171731 | 31.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41888 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028935 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3155801 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462011846 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35288 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3155800 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2020 | B1 | EP3155800 | 19.04.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462011823 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35276 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3154642 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35290 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011852 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3154417 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35279 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011842 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3154416 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462011828 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35278 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3154392 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2020 | B1 | EP3154392 | 19.04.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35291 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011857 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111280770 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462011823 | 13.06.2014 | CN201580031674 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107743421B | Global Dossier | 09.02.2021 | B | CN107743421 | 27.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514968279 | 14.12.2015 | US201514968177 | 14.12.2015 | US201514968248 | 14.12.2015 | US201514968215 | 14.12.2015 | WO2016US12425 | 07.01.2016 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107743390 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | WO2016US36782 | 10.06.2016 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858367 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107734995B | Global Dossier | 30.11.2021 | B | CN107734995 | 23.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | WO2016US36781 | 10.06.2016 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858357 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107708475 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858390 | 18.09.2015 | WO2016US36783 | 10.06.2016 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106793855B | Global Dossier | 18.02.2022 | B | CN106793855 | 31.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41881 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028948 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106572737B | Global Dossier | 06.11.2020 | B | CN106572737 | 19.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028937 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41889 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106572734B | Global Dossier | 24.07.2020 | B | CN106572734 | 19.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41888 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028935 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106535704 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41880 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028944 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106535703 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028951 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41882 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106535701 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028929 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41887 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106488763 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35290 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011852 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106457848B | Global Dossier | 09.11.2018 | B | CN106457848 | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35279 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011842 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106457847B | Global Dossier | 22.03.2019 | B | CN106457847 | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35291 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011857 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106457288B | Global Dossier | 11.05.2021 | B | CN106457288 | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462011846 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35288 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106456055B | Global Dossier | 14.04.2020 | B | CN106456055 | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462011823 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35276 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106456005B | Global Dossier | 08.12.2020 | B | CN106456005 | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462011828 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35278 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3024544 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2020 | C | CA3024544 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2949118 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011842 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2987341 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2021 | C | CA2987341 | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | WO2016US36781 | 10.06.2016 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858357 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2987283 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2020 | C | CA2987283 | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858390 | 18.09.2015 | WO2016US36783 | 10.06.2016 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2987280 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2020 | C | CA2987280 | 15.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514736563 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736551 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736584 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807198 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807297 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807231 | 23.07.2015 | US201514736524 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736534 | 11.06.2015 | US201514736507 | 11.06.2015 | US201514807360 | 23.07.2015 | US201514807140 | 23.07.2015 | WO2016US36782 | 10.06.2016 | US201514807257 | 23.07.2015 | US201514858367 | 18.09.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2954905 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2021 | C | CA2954905 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41888 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028935 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2953236 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028929 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41887 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2953231 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2019 | C | CA2953231 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028937 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41889 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2953062 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2020 | C | CA2953062 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028951 | 25.07.2014 | WO2015US41882 | 24.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2952177 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41880 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028944 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2952176 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41881 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028948 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2950076 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35290 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011852 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2949129 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2020 | C | CA2949129 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462011823 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35276 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2949123 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2019 | C | CA2949123 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35291 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011857 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2949119 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2019 | C | CA2949119 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462011846 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35288 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2949118 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2019 | C | CA2949118 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US35279 | 11.06.2015 | US201462011842 | 13.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2949116 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2018 | C | CA2949116 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462011828 | 13.06.2014 | WO2015US35278 | 11.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3171761 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US41880 | 24.07.2015 | US201462028944 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016014889 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028937 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016014888 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028935 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016014887 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028929 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016014886 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028951 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016014885 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028948 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016014884 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462028944 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019141684 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028937 | 25.07.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6638040B | Global Dossier | 29.01.2020 | B2 | JP2019005611 | 17.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462028951 | 25.07.2014 |