EP3104769 - MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL OF BODY FAT PERCENT DURING PREGNANCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIR Technologies Inc. 1312 Fairmeadow Trail Oakville, ON L6M 2M2 / CA | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AZIZIAN, Hormoz 1312 Fairmeadow Trail Oakville, Ontario L6M 2M2 / CA | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2016/51] | Application number, filing date | 15748794.3 | 13.02.2015 | [2016/51] | WO2015CA00082 | Priority number, date | US201461940125P | 14.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461940125 P | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015120540 | Date: | 20.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3104769 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 20.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G06F19/00 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
A61B5/4872 (EP,US);
A61B5/0075 (EP,US);
A61B5/4343 (EP,US);
A61B5/486 (US);
A61B5/7225 (US);
A61B5/7257 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/51] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Title | German: | MESSUNG UND KONTROLLE DES KÖRPERFETTS IN PROZENT WÄHREND DER SCHWANGERSCHAFT | [2016/51] | English: | MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL OF BODY FAT PERCENT DURING PREGNANCY | [2016/51] | French: | MESURE ET SURVEILLANCE DE POURCENTAGE DE GRAISSE CORPORELLE PENDANT LA GROSSESSE | [2016/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 12.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 01.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1413247 (NIR TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [Y] 3,13 * paragraphs [0021] - [0028] * | [XYI] - ANNICA SOHLSTROM ET AL, "Changes in total body fat during the human reproductive cycle as assessed by magnetic resonance imaging, body water dilution, and skinfold thickness: a comparison of methods'", AM J CLIN NUTR, (19970101), vol. 66, pages 1315 - 22, XP055219107 [X] 1,2,5-8,12 * page 1315, column left, line 1 - page 1320, column right, line 39 * * tables 1-4 * [Y] 3,4,13 [I] 9-11 | [Y] - ANDREA R. JOSSE ET AL, "Body Fat Content Determination in Premenopausal, Overweight, and Obese Young Women Using DXA and FT-NIR", OBESITY RESEARCH, US, (20110310), vol. 19, no. 7, doi:10.1038/oby.2011.39, ISSN 1930-7381, pages 1497 - 1502, XP055219115 [Y] 3,4,13 * abstract * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/oby.2011.39 | International search | [XP] - AZIZIAN, H. et al., "First Direct Body Fat Content Measurement During Pregnancy Using Fourier Transform Near-Infrared Spectroscopy", Applied Spectroscopy, (20140224), vol. 68, no. Issue 3, pages 379 - 382, XP055219101 [XP] 1-13 * See the whole paper. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1366/13-07256 | [XY] - SOHLSTROM, A. et al., "Changes in total body fat during the human reproductive cycle as assessed by magnetic resonance imaging, body water dilution, and skinfold thickness: a comparison of methods", American Journal of Clinical Nutrition, (19980100), vol. 66, no. Issue 6, pages 1315 - 22, XP055219107 [X] 1, 2, 5-12 * . See abstract, p. 1315, section "Introduction"; p. 1318, Table 2; p. 1320, Table 4 and right col., last paragraph. * [Y] 3, 4, 13 | [Y] - JOSSE, A.R. et al., "Body fat content determination in premenopausal, overweight, and obese young women using DXA and FT-NIR", Obesity, (20110300), vol. 19, no. Issue 7, pages 1497 - 5 02, XP055219115 [Y] 3, 4, 13 * See abstract, p. 1497, right col., second paragraph to its end on p. 1498; p. 1498, left col., sections "Subjects", "DXA" and "FT_NIR methods and procedures"; p. 1500, right col., first paragraph under section "Discussion"; p. 1501, left col, last paragraph, and right col, last 4 lines of section "D * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/oby.2011.39 |