EP3106174 - IMMUNOTHERAPEUTIC COMPOSITION, THERAPEUTIC METHOD AND DIAGNOSTIC METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wang, Bin Room 101 Unit1 Building 38 No.17 Qinghua East Road Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | For all designated states Jin, Jin Room 1013Z05 10th Floor No.26 Shangdi Xinxi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | For all designated states Xie, Xiaoping Room 1013Z05 10th Floor No.26 Shangdi Xinxi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | For all designated states He, Zhonghuai Room 1013Z05 10th Floor No.26 Shangdi Xinxi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | For all designated states Yu, Qingling Room 1013Z05 10th Floor No.26 Shangdi Xinxi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | For all designated states Beijing Advaccine Biotechnology Co. Ltd. Room 1013Z05 10th Floor 26 Shangdi Xinxi Road Hadian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Bin Room 101, Unit1, Building 38 No.17, Qinghua East Road, Haidian District / CN | 02 /
JIN, Jin Room 1013Z05, 10th floor No.26, ShangDi Xinxi Road, Haidian District / CN | 03 /
XIE, Xiaoping Room 1013Z05, 10th floor No.26, ShangDi Xinxi Road, Haidian District / CN | 04 /
HE, Zhonghuai Room 1013Z05, 10th floor No.26, ShangDi Xinxi Road, Haidian District / CN | 05 /
YU, Qingling Room 1013Z05, 10th floor No.26, ShangDi Xinxi Road, Haidian District / CN | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Leonard, Thomas Charles Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/51] | Leonard, Thomas Charles Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15749159.8 | 10.02.2015 | [2016/51] | WO2015CN72708 | Priority number, date | US201461938307P | 11.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461938307 P | [2016/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015120792 | Date: | 20.08.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3106174 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/20, A61P31/16 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
A61K38/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/2086 (KR);
A61K39/145 (US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
G01N33/56983 (KR);
G01N33/6869 (KR,US);
A61K2039/55527 (US);
A61K48/00 (US);
C12N2760/16134 (US);
G01N2333/11 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Title | German: | IMMUNTHERAPEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, THERAPEUTISCHES VERFAHREN UND DIAGNOSEVERFAHREN | [2016/51] | English: | IMMUNOTHERAPEUTIC COMPOSITION, THERAPEUTIC METHOD AND DIAGNOSTIC METHOD | [2016/51] | French: | COMPOSITION IMMUNOTHÉRAPEUTIQUE, MÉTHODE THÉRAPEUTIQUE ET MÉTHODE DIAGNOSTIQUE | [2016/51] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2016 | Translation filed | 08.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 08.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 13.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CN102218139 (BEIJING AIDI WEIXIN BIOLOG TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-10,14 * abstract * * sequence 2 * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]WO2009003096 (CENTOCOR INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * sequence 1 * * pages 1,46 * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]US2011038868 (CHEN JIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * sequence 11 * * figures 5a,5b,7 * * paragraphs [0055] , [0060] , [0370] * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]WO2008134659 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0244] * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]US2004043397 (CHEN JIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] , [0064] * [Y] 1-16 | International search | [X]CN102764430 (AMMS CHINA, et al) [X] 1-13, 21-30 * , claims 1-2, and embodiments 2 and 6 *; | [A]CN101119745 (GENITRIX LLC [US]) [A] 1-30 * , see the whole document *; | [A]CN102188707 (INST BASIC MED SCIENCES PLA) [A] 1-30 * , see the whole document * | [X] - WANG, XIAOHUI et al., "A Critical Role of IL -17 in Modulating the B- cell Response During H5N1 Influenza Virus Infection", CELLULAR & MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (20110926), XP055357631 [X] 14-20 * , sections of abstract, introduction, conclusion and discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cmi.2011.38 |