EP3104995 - METHOD OF MAKING A METAL MATRIX COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceradyne Inc. 3169 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDRY-DÉSY, Étienne 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
GIASSON, Geneviéve 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
NAWAZ, Muhammad Zubair 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire Theatinerstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/50] | Mathys & Squire Mathys & Squire Europe LLP Maximilianstraße 35 Eingang A 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/51] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15749700.9 | 12.02.2015 | [2016/51] | WO2015US15548 | Priority number, date | US201461939357P | 13.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461939357 P | [2016/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015123380 | Date: | 20.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3104995 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3104995 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/02, B22F3/17, B22F3/18, B22F3/20, B22F7/08, C22C32/00 | [2019/24] | CPC: |
B22F3/17 (EP,KR,US);
B22F3/18 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/12 (EP,KR,US);
B22F3/02 (US);
B22F3/20 (US);
B22F7/04 (US);
B22F7/08 (EP,KR,US);
C22C32/0057 (EP,KR,US);
B22F2003/175 (US);
B22F2003/185 (US);
B22F2003/208 (EP,KR,US);
B22F2007/042 (US);
B22F2301/052 (US);
B22F2301/058 (US);
B22F2301/35 (US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F3/02, B22F2003/208 (US,EP);
B22F2998/10, B22F3/02, B22F3/17 (US,EP);
B22F2998/10, B22F3/02, B22F3/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/42] | B22F3/03, B22F3/17, B22F3/18, B22F3/20, B22F3/02, B22F3/04, C22C32/00 | ||
Former IPC [2016/51] | B22F3/03, B22F3/17, B22F3/18, B22F3/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES METALL-MATRIX-VERBUNDSTOFFS | [2016/51] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING A METAL MATRIX COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2016/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE À MATRICE MÉTALLIQUE | [2016/51] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 11.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2015 | AL | 11.12.2019 | AT | 11.12.2019 | CY | 11.12.2019 | CZ | 11.12.2019 | DK | 11.12.2019 | EE | 11.12.2019 | FI | 11.12.2019 | HR | 11.12.2019 | IT | 11.12.2019 | LT | 11.12.2019 | LV | 11.12.2019 | MC | 11.12.2019 | MK | 11.12.2019 | MT | 11.12.2019 | NL | 11.12.2019 | PL | 11.12.2019 | RO | 11.12.2019 | RS | 11.12.2019 | SE | 11.12.2019 | SI | 11.12.2019 | SK | 11.12.2019 | SM | 11.12.2019 | TR | 11.12.2019 | IE | 12.02.2020 | LU | 12.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 11.03.2020 | GB | 11.03.2020 | NO | 11.03.2020 | GR | 12.03.2020 | IS | 11.04.2020 | PT | 06.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.02.2015 | |
AL | 11.12.2019 | ||
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CY | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
MT | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GB | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
GB | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
IE | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
SM | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 11.12.2019 | |
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
RS | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 11.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2643444 (BROOKS & PERKINS) [X] 1,4-9,11,12 * claims 1, 3, 5, 6, 9 * * page 4, lines 17-33 * * page 5, lines 1-17 * * page 6, lines 3-11, 33-34 * * figure 1 * [A] 2,3,10; | [XA]GB1516025 (BROOKS & PERKINS) [X] 1,4-9,11,12 * claims 1, 6-8, 11 * * column 2, lines 72-84 * * figure 1 * [A] 2,3,10; | [XA]CH643390 (BROOKS & PERKINS [US]) [X] 1,3-7,12 * claims 1, 3, 5, 6, * * page 3, column lhc, lines 52-68 * * page 3, column rhc, lines 1-2 * * figure 1 *[A] 2,8-11; | [XA]US2005106056 (PENG JACK Y [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-12 * claims 1, 2, 4, 13, 19, 20 * * paragraphs [0033] , [0 34] , [0 37] , [0 46] , [0 48] , [0 49] * * figure 2 * [A] 4,8,9; | [XA]EP1837103 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-8,11,12 * paragraphs [0039] , [0 42] , [0 44] , [0 46] * * examples 1, 2 * [A] 2-4,9,10; | [X]WO2009054075 (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * claims 1, 2, 8, 9, 12-17 * * page 15, lines 22-23 * * page 18, lines 15-16 * * page 22, lines 16-23 * * page 23, lines 1-6 * * page 31, lines 1-10 * * page 32, lines 10-14 * * page 36, lines 20-23 * * figures 1, 2, 8 *; | [XA]CN102676858 (NUCLEAR POWER INST CHINA) [X] 1-3,5-7,11,12 * claim 1 * [A] 4,8-10 | International search | [A]US5700962 (CARDEN ROBIN A [US]) [A] 1-3* See column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 18, claims 1, 5, and figure 1. *; | [A]US2004141866 (FORSBERG CHARLES W [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * See abstract, claims 1-6, and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US7625520 (PENG JACK Y [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * See abstract, column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 34, and figure 2. *; | [X]US7854886 (TAMAKI YUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * See abstract, column 7, line 15 - column 10, line 35, and figures 1-2B. *; | [X]US7998401 (OKANIWA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * See column 9, line 7 - column 11, line 49, column 12, lines 55-65, claims 1-5, 12-15, and figures 3, 5. * |