EP3164877 - BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enocell Limited BioCity Scotland Bo'Ness Road Newhouse Lanarkshire, Strathclyde ML1 5UH / GB | [2017/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACPHEE, Donald Enocell Limited BioCity Scotland Bo'Ness Road Newhouse Lanarkshire Strathclyde ML1 5UH / GB | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | Lawrie IP Limited 10 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/04] | Lawrie IP Limited 310 St. Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5RG / GB | ||
Former [2017/19] | Lawrie, Donald James Lawrie IP Limited The Hub Pacific Quay Pacific Drive Glasgow G51 1EA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15750086.9 | 06.07.2015 | [2017/19] | WO2015GB51955 | Priority number, date | GB20140011985 | 04.07.2014 Original published format: GB 201411985 | [2017/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016001692 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3164877 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3164877 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04, H01G11/06, H01M10/052, H01M10/058, H01M10/36, H01M10/38 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
H01G11/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/049 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/48 (KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0569 (KR);
H01M10/058 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/36 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/38 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/483 (KR);
H01M2300/0005 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02E60/13 (US);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/19] | H01G9/00, H01G11/06, H01M10/04, H01M10/052, H01M10/058, H01M10/38, H01M10/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIE | [2017/19] | English: | BATTERY | [2017/19] | French: | PILE | [2021/22] |
Former [2017/19] | BATTERIE | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/19] | 03.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 27.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2020 | 31.07.2020 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2021 | 31.07.2021 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2015 | AL | 26.01.2022 | AT | 26.01.2022 | CY | 26.01.2022 | CZ | 26.01.2022 | DK | 26.01.2022 | EE | 26.01.2022 | ES | 26.01.2022 | FI | 26.01.2022 | HR | 26.01.2022 | IT | 26.01.2022 | LT | 26.01.2022 | LV | 26.01.2022 | MC | 26.01.2022 | MK | 26.01.2022 | MT | 26.01.2022 | NL | 26.01.2022 | PL | 26.01.2022 | RO | 26.01.2022 | RS | 26.01.2022 | SE | 26.01.2022 | SI | 26.01.2022 | SK | 26.01.2022 | SM | 26.01.2022 | BG | 26.04.2022 | NO | 26.04.2022 | GR | 27.04.2022 | IS | 26.05.2022 | PT | 26.05.2022 | GB | 06.07.2022 | IE | 06.07.2022 | LU | 06.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | FR | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.07.2015 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
MK | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
GB | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 06.07.2015 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
GB | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.07.2015 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
GB | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
GB | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
GB | 06.07.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
GB | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
DK | 26.01.2022 | ||
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
ES | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 26.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0260679 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-8 * page 9, line 30 - line 51; examples 13, 14 *; | [A]US2013183589 (MINAMIDA YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0101] - [0128] *; | [A]US2009253025 (WHITACRE JAY [US]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0046] - [0077]; figure 1 * | Examination | US2011255214 | US2008131773 | - NAM K W ET AL, "Novel concept of pseudocapacitor using stabilized lithium metal powder and non-lithiated metal oxide electrodes in organic electrolyte", ELECTROCHEMISTRY COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 11, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.ELECOM.2009.03.038, ISSN 1388-2481, (20090601), pages 1166 - 1169, (20090402), XP026157820 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.elecom.2009.03.038 | by applicant | - JAYARAMAN, S. ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. B, (2005), vol. 109, pages 22958 - 66 |