EP3195675 - DEVICE-TO-DEVICE (D2D) PRE-EMPTION AND ACCESS CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2020 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, 19809 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | For all designated states Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUDOLF, Marian 1843 Rue Baile Montreal, QC H3H 1P5 / CA | 02 /
PELLETIER, Benoit 11-13th Street Roxboro, QC H8Y 1L3 / CA | 03 /
PANI, Diana 730 Lusignan Apt. 4 Montreal, QC H3C 1Y9 / CA | 04 /
MARINIER, Paul 1805 Stravinski Brossard, QC J4X 2J7 / CA | 05 /
KAUR, Samian 6 Ashwood Lane Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | 06 /
FREDA, Martino M. 7131 Du Cabemet Laval, QC H7A 0A8 / CA | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Östra Storgatan 7 553 21 Jönköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Awapatent AB Östra Storgatan 7 553 21 Jönköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 15750584.3 | 06.08.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015US44088 | Priority number, date | US201462034115P | 06.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462034115 P | US201562144132P | 07.04.2015 Original published format: US 201562144132 P | US201562161108P | 13.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562161108 P | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016022849 | Date: | 11.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3195675 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
H04W72/04 (EP,IL,US);
H04L12/1863 (IL,RU,US);
H04W72/40 (KR);
H04L67/104 (EP,IL,US);
H04W4/70 (IL,KR,US);
H04W72/02 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (IL);
H04W72/1263 (IL,KR);
H04W72/23 (IL);
H04W72/25 (KR);
H04W72/542 (KR);
H04W72/566 (IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG-ZU VORRICHTUNG (D2D)-VORWEGNAHME- UND -ZUGANGSSTEUERUNG | [2017/30] | English: | DEVICE-TO-DEVICE (D2D) PRE-EMPTION AND ACCESS CONTROL | [2017/30] | French: | PRÉEMPTION ET CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS DE DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF (D2D) | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 20.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/24] | Appeal following examination | 07.02.2019 | Appeal received No. J0005/19 | 12.04.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 21.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP18171252.2 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 08.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2013114531 (AHN JAE YOUNG [KR], et al); | [E]WO2015116865 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]); |