EP3185977 - VALVE FOR CARRYING OUT A MASS TRANSFER PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIESE, Reiner Oberstrasse 3a 67814 Dannenfels / DE | 02 /
HÄDICKE, Stefan Danziger Strasse 6 67240 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Egon Unterer Brunnenweg 2 66424 Homburg / DE | 04 /
PASCHOLD, Jürgen Kiefernweg 5 67691 Hochspeyer / DE | 05 /
ANDRES, Torsten Am Forstbann 24 64653 Lorsch / DE | 06 /
SHILKIN, Alexey Albert-Haueisen-Ring 17 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | Kudla, Karsten Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/27] | Kudla, Karsten Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 15751043.9 | 24.08.2015 | [2017/27] | WO2015EP69339 | Priority number, date | EP20140182081 | 25.08.2014 Original published format: EP 14182081 | [2017/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016030322 | Date: | 03.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3185977 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/16, B01D3/20, B01D3/30 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
B01D3/163 (EP,CN,US);
B01D3/20 (EP,CN,US);
B01D3/30 (EP,CN,US);
B01D5/0012 (EP,CN,US);
B01D53/02 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Title | German: | VENTIL ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES STOFFAUSTAUSCHPROZESSES | [2017/27] | English: | VALVE FOR CARRYING OUT A MASS TRANSFER PROCESS | [2017/27] | French: | VANNE DESTINÉE À METTRE EN UVRE UN PROCESSUS DE TRANSFERT DE MATIÈRE | [2017/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 18.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 24.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE2846679 (LINDE AG) [I] 1-12 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP2033698 (MALETA BOGDAN VLADIMIROVICH [UA]; MALETA OLESJA VLADIMIROVNA [UA]) [AD] 1-12 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP2033698 | EP2027901 | RU2237508 |