EP3108287 - HEAD MOUNTED DISPLAY GOGGLES FOR USE WITH MOBILE COMPUTING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merge Labs, Inc. 506 Tammy Dr. San Antonio, Texas 78216 / US | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYONS, Franklin A. c/o Merge Labs Inc. 506 Tammy Dr. San Antonio, Texas 78216 / US | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Bettinastraße 53-55 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 15751618.8 | 18.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015US16445 | Priority number, date | US201461941294P | 18.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461941294 P | US201462060996P | 07.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462060996 P | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015126987 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3108287 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G06T19/00 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
G02B27/0176 (EP,US);
A63F13/00 (EP,US);
A63F13/26 (EP,US);
A63F13/98 (EP,US);
G02B27/0093 (EP,US);
G02B27/017 (US);
G02B27/0172 (US);
G02B27/022 (US);
G02B27/028 (US);
G02B30/34 (US);
G02B7/023 (US);
G06F1/163 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/012 (US);
G06F3/0231 (EP,US);
G06F3/0338 (EP,US);
G06F3/03545 (US);
G06T19/006 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0134 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0154 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0169 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | G02B27/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Title | German: | KOPFMONTIERTE ANZEIGEBRILLE ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT MOBILEN RECHNERVORRICHTUNGEN | [2016/52] | English: | HEAD MOUNTED DISPLAY GOGGLES FOR USE WITH MOBILE COMPUTING DEVICES | [2016/52] | French: | LUNETTES D'AFFICHAGE FACIAL À UTILISER AVEC DES DISPOSITIFS INFORMATIQUES MOBILES | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 14.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010079356 (HOELLWARTH QUIN C [US]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0284]; figures 1-21 * [I] 2-4,6-9; | [A]US6067192 (LICHTENFIELD LOUIS [US], et al) [A] 3 * abstract *; | [A]US5422684 (KELLER DAVID R [US]) [A] 9 * column 7, line 45 - column 8, line 16; figures 10-11 * | [XP] - Marcus Hutter, "DIY 3D Virtual Reality Goggles (Overview)", hutter1.net, (20140421), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.hutter1.net/puzzles/3dvrglass.htm, (20170323), XP055357869 [XP] 1-4 * the whole document * | International search | [YA]US4707863 (MCNEAL JOSEPH R [US]) [Y] 1-7 and 9 * , fig 1, 3 and 7, col 5, In 53-62 * [A] 8; | [YA]US2011304577 (BROWN PAUL ANSON [US], et al) [Y] 10 * , entire document especially, fig 1, para [0075] * [A] 11-14; | [YA]US2008015017 (ASHIDA KENICHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 15-18 and 20 * , entire document especially, fig 7A, 7B, 20 and 21, para [0077] and [0089]-[0090] * [A] 19 and 21; | [YA]US2011261452 (KORY MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 2 and 6-7 * , entire document especially, fig 4C, para [0095], [0107] and [0114] * [A] 8; | [Y]US6067192 (LICHTENFIELD LOUIS [US], et al) [Y] 3 and 4 * , fig 2 and 3, col 7, In 9-23 *; | [Y]US5422684 (KELLER DAVID R [US]) [Y] 9 * , cot 7, In 60-65 *; | [A]US8605008 (PREST CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al) [A] 15-21 * , entire document * | [YA] - MARCUS HUTTER, "DIY 3D Virtual Reality Goggles", (20140121), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20140121022840/http//www.hutter1.net/puzzles/3dvrglass.htm, XP055357869 [Y] 1-7 and 9-10, 15-18, 20 * , entire document especially, pages 1 and 4 * [A] 8 11-14, 19 and 21 |