EP3107829 - FRESH PRODUCE STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sway International Pty Ltd PO Box 5155 Greenwich, New South Wales 2065 / AU | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PINI, Peita PO Box 5155 Greenwich, New South Wales 2065 / AU | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Loyer & Abello 9, rue Anatole de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [2016/52] | Application number, filing date | 15751883.8 | 20.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015AU50066 | Priority number, date | AU20140900539 | 20.02.2014 Original published format: AU 2014900539 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015123731 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107829 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3107829 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/26, B65D81/24, B65D30/08, B65D85/50, B65B25/02, A01F25/00, B65D81/22 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
B65D81/263 (EP,KR,US);
A01F25/00 (KR);
B65B25/02 (KR);
B65B25/041 (US);
B65B5/067 (US);
B65D63/1018 (US);
B65D81/22 (EP,US);
B65D81/24 (KR);
B65D81/264 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | B65D81/26, B65D81/24, B65D30/08, B65D85/50, B65B25/02, A01F25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FRISCHWARENAUFBEWAHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/52] | English: | FRESH PRODUCE STORAGE DEVICE | [2016/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE DE PRODUITS FRAIS | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 16.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 16.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2015 | AL | 28.08.2019 | CY | 28.08.2019 | CZ | 28.08.2019 | EE | 28.08.2019 | FI | 28.08.2019 | HR | 28.08.2019 | LT | 28.08.2019 | LV | 28.08.2019 | MC | 28.08.2019 | MK | 28.08.2019 | MT | 28.08.2019 | PL | 28.08.2019 | RO | 28.08.2019 | RS | 28.08.2019 | SI | 28.08.2019 | SK | 28.08.2019 | SM | 28.08.2019 | TR | 28.08.2019 | BG | 28.11.2019 | GR | 29.11.2019 | IS | 28.12.2019 | PT | 30.12.2019 | LU | 20.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 20.02.2015 | |
AL | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
MT | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
LU | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 28.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1065155 (TECHNICOR INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1,7,8,12-17; claims 1,2,7-9 * [Y] 6-8 [I] 5,10-15; | [IY]EP1418136 (SCHMIDT HEINZ-DIETER [DE]) [I] 13-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1-5; claims 1-9 * [Y] 6-8; | [A]US7841586 (MONGEON DOUGLAS R [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 6, line 6 - column 8, line 27; figures 1-10; claims 1-13 * | International search | [A]JPH03289475 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-20* EPODOC Abstract *; | [X]US2007202220 (DICOSOLA SUSAN T [US]) [X] 1-11, 15-20 * Figure 3; Paragraphs [0040]-[0042], [0047] *; | [A]US2008190786 (SCHMIDT ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 1-20 * Whole document * | [A] - URL: http://www.amazon.com/Simple-Ecology-Organic-Cotton-Produce/dp/B004UJOUOC [A] 16-20 * (The International Searching Authority is unable to establish the publication date of the above citation, however the citation contents are dated prior to the earliest priority date of the application, and are relevant to the claimed invention with respect to inventive step). Pages 1, 3-5. * | [A] - URL: http://whosgreenaz.com/ 2012/04/06 /do-you-know-how-to-store-fresh-produce [A] 16-20 * (The International Searching Authority is unable to establish the publication date of the above citation, however the citation contents are dated prior to the earliest priority date of the application, and are relevant to the claimed invention with respect to inventive step). Pages 3, 4 * |