EP3113263 - GAS DIFFUSION ELECTRODE SUBSTRATE, AS WELL AS MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY AND FUEL CELL PROVIDED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/01] | GAS DIFFUSION ELECTRODE SUBSTRATE, AND MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY AND FUEL CELL PROVIDED THEREWITH | ||
[2018/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIMURA, Yasuaki c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
UTSUNOMIYA, Masamichi c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
KAMAE, Toshiya c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2017/01] | Application number, filing date | 15752113.9 | 17.02.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015JP54194 | Priority number, date | JP20140032828 | 24.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014032828 | [2017/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015125748 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3113263 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3113263 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/0234, H01M8/0239, H01M8/0245, // H01M8/1018 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
H01M8/0234 (EP,US);
H01M4/8605 (KR,US);
H01M4/8631 (US);
H01M4/8663 (KR);
H01M4/8673 (KR);
H01M4/92 (KR);
H01M4/96 (KR,US);
H01M8/0239 (EP,US);
H01M8/0245 (EP,US);
H01M8/1004 (US);
H01M2004/8694 (US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/01] | H01M4/86, H01M4/96, H01M8/02, H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASDIFFUSIONSELEKTRODENSUBSTRAT SOWIE MEMBRANELEKTRODENANORDNUNG UND BRENNSTOFFZELLE DASSELBE UMFASSEND | [2018/12] | English: | GAS DIFFUSION ELECTRODE SUBSTRATE, AS WELL AS MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY AND FUEL CELL PROVIDED THEREWITH | [2018/12] | French: | SUBSTRAT D'ÉLECTRODE DE DIFFUSION DE GAZ, AINSI QU'ENSEMBLE MEMBRANE-ÉLECTRODE ET PILE À COMBUSTIBLE COMPORTANT CE DERNIER | [2018/12] |
Former [2017/01] | GASDIFFUSIONSELEKTRODENSUBSTRAT SOWIE MEMBRANELEKTRODENANORDNUNG UND BRENNSTOFFZELLE DAMIT | ||
Former [2017/01] | GAS DIFFUSION ELECTRODE SUBSTRATE, AND MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY AND FUEL CELL PROVIDED THEREWITH | ||
Former [2017/01] | SUBSTRAT D'ÉLECTRODE DE DIFFUSION DE GAZ, ET ENSEMBLE MEMBRANE-ÉLECTRODE ET PILE À COMBUSTIBLE COMPORTANT LEDIT SUBSTRAT D'ÉLECTRODE DE DIFFUSION DE GAZ | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2016 | Translation filed | 10.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 10.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2015 | AL | 22.08.2018 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | ES | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | HR | 22.08.2018 | IT | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | MK | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | RS | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | SM | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | NO | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | PT | 22.12.2018 | IE | 17.02.2019 | LU | 17.02.2019 | MT | 17.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 17.02.2015 | |
AL | 22.08.2018 | ||
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
MT | 17.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
MT | 17.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
MT | 17.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2006257641 (CHO SUNG-YONG [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,9,11,12,15,16 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0033]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047]; figure 2 * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1, 2, 4-6, 15 * [A] 3-8,10,13,14; | [XA]US2008166542 (SUNG LUNG-YU [TW], et al) [X] 1,2,15,16 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0049]; figures 2A, 2B * * claims 1-4, 6 *[A] 3-14; | [XDA]JP2008277093 (EQUOS RES CO LTD) [XD] 1,2,11,15,16 * abstract * * example 1 * [A] 3-10,12-14; | [XA]CA2868720 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,11-13,15,16 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] * * claim 1 * [A] 3,6-8,10,14 | International search | [A]WO0122510 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * , claim 2; page 5, line 14 to page 6, line 17 & EP 1223628 A1 claim 2; paragraphs [0020] to [0024] *; | [A]JP2010232062 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-7, 9-16* , paragraph [0051]; fig. 6 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2011216375 (ENEOS CELLTECH CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * , claims 1 to 3; paragraphs [0028] to [0032], [0035]; fig. 1, 3 & EP 2555295 A1 claims 1 to 3; paragraphs [0028] to [0032], [0035]; fig. 1, 3 * |