EP3108012 - MIR-320E AND COLORECTAL CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baylor Research Institute 2001 Bryan St., Suite 2200 Dallas, TX 75201 / US | [2018/47] |
Former [2016/52] | For all designated states Baylor Research Institute 3310 Live Oak Street, Suite 501 Dallas, TX 75204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOEL, Ajay 6216 Velasco Avenue Dallas, TX 75214 / US | 02 /
PEREZ-CARBONELL, Lucia c/o Baylor Research Institute 3310 Live Oak Street Suite 501 Dallas, TX 75204 / US | 03 /
BOLAND, C. Richard 2865 Sugarman Court La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2017/03] |
Former [2016/52] | 01 /
GOEL, Ajay 6149 Marquita Avenue Dallas, TX 75214 / US | ||
02 /
PEREZ-CARBONELL, Lucia c/o Baylor Research Institute 3310 Live Oak Street Suite 501 Dallas, TX 75204 / US | |||
03 /
BOLAND, C. Richard 2214 B Allen Street Dallas, TX 75204 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Roberts, Joanne Nicola J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15752265.7 | 18.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015US16285 | Priority number, date | US201461941340P | 18.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461941340 P | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015126886 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3108012 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (US);
G16H10/60 (US);
G16H20/10 (EP);
G16H40/63 (US);
G16H50/30 (EP);
C12N2310/14 (US);
C12N2320/30 (US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Title | German: | MIR-320E UND KOLOREKTALKREBS | [2016/52] | English: | MIR-320E AND COLORECTAL CANCER | [2016/52] | French: | MIR-320E ET CANCER COLORECTAL | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 25.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/04] | 08.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012065098 (CROCE CARLO M [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0245] - [0262]; claims 1-12 * * paragraphs [0173] - [0179] *; | [IY] - SCHEPELER TROELS ET AL, "Diagnostic and prognostic microRNAs in stage II colon cancer", CANCER RESEARCH, AACR - AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20080801), vol. 68, no. 15, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-6110, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 6416 - 6424, XP002529939 [I] 15 * page 6419, column 2 - page 6420, column 1; figure 2A * * abstract * [Y] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-07-6110 | [XY] - JUNIUS SALENDO ET AL, "Identification of a microRNA expression signature for chemoradiosensitivity of colorectal cancer cells, involving miRNAs-320a, -224, -132 and let7g", RADIOTHERAPY AND ONCOLOGY, Ireland, (20130901), vol. 108, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.radonc.2013.06.032, ISSN 0167-8140, pages 451 - 457, XP055402374 [X] 12-14 * abstract * * page 453, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * Supplementary Table 1 * [Y] 1-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.radonc.2013.06.032 | [ ] - Salendo ET AL, "Supplementary Table 1: Diagnostic and prognostic microRNAs in stage II colon cancer", Cancer Research, 68(15), (20080801), URL: http://ars.els-cdn.com/content/image/1-s2.0-S0167814013003113-mmc3.xlsx, (20170831), XP055402697 | [Y] - KEUN HUR ET AL, "Su1880: Identification of a novel metastasis-specific miRNA signature in human colorectal cancer", GASTROENTEROLOGY, US, (20120501), vol. 142, no. 5, doi:10.1016/S0016-5085(12)62016-2, ISSN 0016-5085, pages S - 525, XP055402376 [Y] 10,11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(12)62016-2 | [X] - S.-Z. JIA ET AL, "Plasma miR-17-5p, miR-20a and miR-22 are down-regulated in women with endometriosis", HUMAN REPRODUCTION, (20130201), vol. 28, no. 2, doi:10.1093/humrep/des413, ISSN 0268-1161, pages 322 - 330, XP055127856 [X] 12-14 * Materials and methods;; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humrep/des413 | [A] - FRANKLIN G. BERGER ET AL, "Thymidylate synthase as a chemotherapeutic drug target: Where are we after fifty years?", CANCER BIOLOGY & THERAPY, US, (20060901), vol. 5, no. 9, doi:10.4161/cbt.5.9.3414, ISSN 1538-4047, pages 1238 - 1241, XP055402496 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/cbt.5.9.3414 | International search | [X]WO2009140670 (VERIDEX LLC [US], et al) [X] 43-45 * entire document *; | [A]US2010184046 (KLASS MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 20-22, 41-45, 50 * entire document *; | [A]WO2012119051 (GROOVE BIOPHARMA CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 20-22, 41-45, 50 * entire document *; | [A] - NUGENT et al., "MicroRNAs in colorectal cancer: Function, dysregulation and potential as novel biomarkers", European Journal of Surgical Onocology, (20110531), vol. 37, no. 8, ISSN 0748-7983, pages 649 - 654, XP028100101 [A] 14, 20-22, 41-45, 50 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejso.2011.05.005 | [PX] - PEREZ-CARBONELL et al., "MiR-320e is a Prognostic and Predictive Biomarker in Colorectal Cancer", Gastroenterology, (20140503), vol. 146, no. 5, ISSN 0016-5085, page S-30, XP055221723 [PX] 1-4, 20-22, 41-45, 50 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(14)60105-0 |