Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.01.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] |
06.11.2021 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.11.2021 | First examination report | |
15.02.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.03.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.03.2019 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.03.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.09.2017 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
08.09.2017 | Change - classification | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
08.09.2017 | Change - classification | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
21.04.2017 | Change - extension states | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] |
03.03.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.11.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
25.11.2016 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
25.11.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
07.10.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.09.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.09.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.09.2016 | Change - representative | |
09.09.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.09.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.08.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication |