EP3109694 - SPECTACLE LENS SUPPLY SYSTEM, SPECTACLE LENS SUPPLY METHOD, SPECTACLE LENS SUPPLY PROGRAM, SPECTACLE LENS RECOMMENDED TYPE PRESENTATION DEVICE, AND SPECTACLE LENS PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoya Lens Thailand Ltd. 853 Phaholyothin Road Prachatipat Thanyaburi Pathumthani 12130 / TH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | For all designated states Hoya Lens Thailand Ltd. 853 Phaholyothin Rd. Prachatipat 12130 Thanyaburi Patumthani / TH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATANAKA Takashi c/o HOYA CORPORATION 7-5, Nakaochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 161-8525 / JP | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2016/52] | Application number, filing date | 15752504.9 | 19.02.2015 | [2016/52] | WO2015JP54546 | Priority number, date | JP20140029452 | 19.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014029452 | [2016/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015125848 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3109694 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02C13/00, G02C7/06, A61B3/08, // G02C7/14 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
G02C7/027 (EP,US);
G02C7/061 (EP,US);
G02C7/066 (EP,US);
G02C2202/10 (EP);
G02C7/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | G02C13/00, G02C7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Title | German: | BRILLENGLASBEREITSTELLUNGSSYSTEM, BRILLENGLASBEREITSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, BRILLENGLASBEREITSTELLUNGSPROGRAMM, VORRICHTUNG ZUR DARSTELLUNG DES EMPFOHLENEN BRILLENGLASES UND BRILLENGLASHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/52] | English: | SPECTACLE LENS SUPPLY SYSTEM, SPECTACLE LENS SUPPLY METHOD, SPECTACLE LENS SUPPLY PROGRAM, SPECTACLE LENS RECOMMENDED TYPE PRESENTATION DEVICE, AND SPECTACLE LENS PRODUCTION METHOD | [2016/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FOURNITURE DE VERRES DE LUNETTES, PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE DE VERRES DE LUNETTES, PROGRAMME DE FOURNITURE DE VERRES DE LUNETTES, DISPOSITIF DE PRÉSENTATION DE TYPE RECOMMANDÉ DE VERRES DE LUNETTES ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE VERRES DE LUNETTES | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2016 | Translation filed | 19.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 28.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6048064 (HOSOI YOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * figures 46,47 ** column 35, lines 4-11 *; | [Y]US2005083482 (MILLER ANTHONY D [AU], et al) [Y] 1-9 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0082] , [0084] *; | [Y]US2006139571 (POULAIN ISABELLE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0079] , [0080] *; | [Y]US2009248377 (SHINOHARA TOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0032] , [ 0069] , [ 0075] , [ 0086] *; | [Y]US2012307203 (VENDEL JOAR [SE], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0066] * | International search | [A]JP2000107129 (HOYA CORP) [A] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0019] to [0071]; fig. 1 to 19 & US 6329989 B1 & EP 1018691 A1 & DE 69923943 T & AU 5261299 A & AU 755606 B & CA 2284981 A & AT 290241 T & CA 2284981 A1 *; | [A]JP2002014006 (HOYA CORP) [A] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0006] to [0053]; fig. 1 to 16 & US 2002/0041358 A1 & EP 1146328 A2 & DE 60114498 T & AT 308743 T & HK 1037889 A *; | [A]JP2002045336 (HOYA CORP) [A] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0008] to [0050]; fig. 1 to 13 & US 2001/0056338 A1 & EP 1158338 A2 & DE 60117432 T & AT 319119 T & HK 1038073 A *; | [A]US2003058407 (ALLER THOMAS A [US]) [A] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0033] to [0056]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2003177076 (HOYA CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0030] to [0034]; fig. 5 & US 2003/0076479 A1 & EP 1291633 A2 & DE 60206342 T & AT 305605 T & KR 10-2003-0022047 A & CN 1403794 A *; | [Y]JP2009259213 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0006], [0033] to [0034], [0041], [0044]; fig. 1 to 2, 7 to 11 & US 2009/0248377 A1 & EP 2105088 A1 *; | [Y]JP2010165045 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0006], [0034], [0041] to [0042]; fig. 1 to 2, 5 to 9 & US 2010/0179799 A1 *; | [Y]JP2012085697 (NIDEK KK) [Y] 4 * , paragraphs [0033] to [0036], [0043] to [0047]; fig. 6 & US 2012/0092621 A1 *; | [A] - R. LONDON et al., "Fixation disparity analysis: Sensory and motor approaches", Optometry, (20061200), vol. 77, no. 12, ISSN 1529-1839, pages 590 - 608, XP028082292 [A] 1-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.optm.2006.09.006 |