Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016207902 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN1925DE2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10633148 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2020 | B2 | US2017210511 | 27.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN1925DE2014 | WO2015IN00280 | 10.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3166861 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2020 | B1 | EP3166861 | 17.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN1925DE2014 | WO2015IN00280 | 10.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3166861T | 15.02.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | IN1925DE2014 | WO2015IN00280 | 10.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2851426T | 07.09.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | IN1925DE2014 | WO2015IN00280 | 10.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN1925DEL2014 | 31.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | IN1925DE2014 |