EP3111504 - ULTRA-FAST RECHARGEABLE METAL-ION BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | For all designated states Industrial Technology Research Institute No. 195, Sec. 4 Chung Hsing Road Chutung Hsinchu 31040 / TW | [2019/38] |
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of The Leland Stanford Junior University Office of The General Counsel Building 170, 3rd Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | ||
For all designated states Industrial Technology Research Institute No. 195, Sec. 4 Chung Hsing Road Chutung Hsinchu 31040 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAI, Hongjie C/O THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad, P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | 02 /
LIN, Meng-Chang No. 18, Ln. 56, Jifeng Rd. Wufeng Dist., Taichung City 413 / TW | 03 /
GONG, Ming C/O THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Office of the General Counsel Building 17,Third Floor , Main Quad, P.O Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | 04 /
LU, Bingan C/O THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Office of the General Counsel Building 170,Third Floor, Main Quad, P.O ., Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | 05 /
WU, Yingpeng C/O THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Office of the General Counsel Buiding 170,Third Floor, Main Quadm P-O, Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/01] | 01 /
DAI, Hongjie C/O THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad, P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | ||
02 /
LIN, Meng-Chang C/O INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH INSTITUTE 195, Sec. 4 Chung Hsing Rd. Chuntung, Hsinchu 31040 Taiwan, Province of China / CN | |||
03 /
GONG, Ming C/O THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Office of the General Counsel Building 17,Third Floor , Main Quad, P.O Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | |||
04 /
LU, Bingan C/O THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Office of the General Counsel Building 170,Third Floor, Main Quad, P.O ., Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | |||
05 /
WU, Yingpeng C/O THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Office of the General Counsel Buiding 170,Third Floor, Main Quadm P-O, Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | Representative(s) | Bond, Christopher William Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2019/15] |
Former [2017/01] | Bond, Christopher William Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15755807.3 | 27.02.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015US18154 | Priority number, date | US201461946618P | 28.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461946618 P | US201462076420P | 06.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462076420 P | US201514622692 | 13.02.2015 Original published format: US201514622692 | [2017/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015131132 | Date: | 03.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3111504 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3111504 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/054, H01M4/134, H01M10/0566, H01M4/46, H01M4/583, H01M10/0568, H01M10/0569, // H01M4/38, H01M4/48, H01M4/58, H01M4/587, H01M4/02 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
H01M10/054 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H01M4/46 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H01M10/0566 (RU);
H01M10/0568 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/38 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/58 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2004/021 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2300/0031 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/386 (EP,US);
H01M4/483 (EP,US);
H01M4/581 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/01] | H01M10/054, H01M4/134, H01M10/0566, H01M4/46, H01M4/583 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHNELL WIEDERAUFLADBARE METALL-IONEN-BATTERIE | [2018/38] | English: | ULTRA-FAST RECHARGEABLE METAL-ION BATTERY | [2017/01] | French: | BATTERIE À IONS MÉTALLIQUES À RECHARGEMENT ULTRA-RAPIDE | [2017/01] |
Former [2017/01] | ULTRASCHNELL AUFLADBARE METALL-IONEN-BATTERIE | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 14.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2015 | AL | 10.04.2019 | AT | 10.04.2019 | CY | 10.04.2019 | CZ | 10.04.2019 | DK | 10.04.2019 | EE | 10.04.2019 | ES | 10.04.2019 | FI | 10.04.2019 | HR | 10.04.2019 | LT | 10.04.2019 | LV | 10.04.2019 | MC | 10.04.2019 | MK | 10.04.2019 | MT | 10.04.2019 | NL | 10.04.2019 | PL | 10.04.2019 | RO | 10.04.2019 | RS | 10.04.2019 | SE | 10.04.2019 | SI | 10.04.2019 | SK | 10.04.2019 | SM | 10.04.2019 | TR | 10.04.2019 | BG | 10.07.2019 | NO | 10.07.2019 | GR | 11.07.2019 | IS | 10.08.2019 | PT | 10.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 27.02.2015 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
MT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 10.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US4463072 (GIFFORD PAUL R [US], et al); | [Y]US2012058392 (CORREIA PEDRO MANUEL BRITO DA SILVA [PT]); | [X]US2012082904 (BROWN GILBERT M [US], et al); | International search | [XY]US4463072 (GIFFORD PAUL R [US], et al); | [X]US5554458 (NODA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al); | [X]US2010316914 (CORREIA PEDRO MANUEL BRITO DA SILVA [US]); | [Y]US2012045688 (LIU CHENGUANG [US], et al); | [X]US2012082904 (BROWN GILBERT M [US], et al) |