EP3188820 - PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR CLEANING WASTE GAS BY MEANS OF ALKALINE ABSORBENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/28] | PROCESSES AND SYSTEMS FOR CLEANING WASTE GAS BY MEANS OF ALKALINE ABSORBENTS | ||
[2018/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sahrhage, Torsten Kastnerweg 7 83246 Unterwössen / DE | [2018/20] |
Former [2017/28] | For all designated states Sahrhage, Torsten Obernstrasse 22 32139 Sprenge / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Kohlmann, Kai Donatusstraße 1 52078 Aachen / DE | [2017/28] | Application number, filing date | 15756571.4 | 08.08.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015EP68319 | Priority number, date | DE20141013181 | 05.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014013181 | [2017/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016034367 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3188820 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3188820 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34, B01D53/82, B01D53/83, F23J15/02, F23G7/06, F28D17/00, F23L15/04, F27D17/00 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
B01D53/343 (EP);
B01D53/346 (EP);
B01D53/82 (EP);
B01D53/83 (EP);
F23G7/068 (EP);
F23J15/02 (EP);
F23L15/04 (EP);
F27D17/008 (EP);
B01D2251/206 (EP);
B01D2251/402 (EP);
B01D2251/404 (EP);
B01D2251/606 (EP);
B01D2253/304 (EP);
B01D2257/2045 (EP);
B01D2257/2047 (EP);
B01D2257/302 (EP);
B01D2257/404 (EP);
B01D2257/702 (EP);
B01D2258/0283 (EP);
B01D2258/0291 (EP);
B01D2259/40084 (EP);
B01D2259/4566 (EP);
B01D2259/655 (EP);
B01D53/508 (EP);
B01D53/56 (EP);
B01D53/64 (EP);
B01D53/685 (EP);
B01D53/72 (EP);
B01D53/73 (EP);
B01D53/96 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR ABGASREINIGUNG MITTELS BASISCHER ABSORBENZIEN | [2018/12] | English: | PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR CLEANING WASTE GAS BY MEANS OF ALKALINE ABSORBENTS | [2018/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DE NETTOYAGE DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT À L'AIDE D'ABSORBANTS BASIQUES | [2017/28] |
Former [2017/28] | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGEN ZUR ABGASREINIGUNG MITTELS BASISCHER ABSORBENZIEN | ||
Former [2017/28] | PROCESSES AND SYSTEMS FOR CLEANING WASTE GAS BY MEANS OF ALKALINE ABSORBENTS | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 02.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2015 | AL | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | ES | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | IT | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | MT | 06.06.2018 | PL | 06.06.2018 | PT | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | RS | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | IE | 08.08.2018 | LU | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | NO | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.08.2015 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
MK | 06.06.2018 | ||
MT | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PT | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 08.08.2015 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
MT | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PT | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
MT | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PT | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
MT | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
MT | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
ES | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
IT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 06.06.2018 | |
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [IA]EP0362553 (GUTEHOFFNUNGSHUETTE MAN [DE]) [I] 7-26 * abstract * * column 1, lines 32-39 * * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 4 * [A] 1-6; | [A]WO9014560 (KANZLER WALTER [AT], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * page 1, lines 3-6 * * page 1, line 36 - page 3, line 28 * * page 9, line 11 - page 10, line 30 *; | [AD]DE4336460 (HELLMICH FRIEDRICH [DE]) [AD] 1-26 * abstract * * column 1, lines 3-10 * * column 1, line 35 - column 4, line 16 *; | [A]AT400006B (KVT VERFAHRENSTECH GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-26 * page 2, lines 1-13; figures 1,2 * * page 3, lines 7-44 * * page 4, line 42 - page 5, line 46 *; | [A]DE10256076 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0009] - [0011] , [0020] , [0023] , [0026] - [0032] *; | [A]EP2559475 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0015] , [0038] - [0055] *; | [A]WO2014034743 (SINTOKOGIO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-26* the whole document * | by applicant | DE3344571 | DE8335361U | DE4307007 | DE4336460 | DE102010016004 |