EP3189588 - MULTI-BAND LOW NOISE AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Saihua 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2017/28] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2020/17] |
Former [2017/28] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15756801.5 | 25.08.2015 | [2017/28] | WO2015US46724 | Priority number, date | US201414478691 | 05.09.2014 Original published format: US201414478691 | [2017/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016036537 | Date: | 10.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3189588 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3189588 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/193, H03F1/22, H03F1/32, H03F3/24, H03F3/68 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
H03F1/223 (EP,KR,US);
H03F3/193 (EP,KR,US);
H03F3/191 (US);
H03F1/3205 (EP,KR,US);
H03F1/565 (KR,US);
H03F3/245 (EP,KR,US);
H03F3/68 (EP,KR,US);
H03F2200/111 (EP,KR,US);
H03F2200/171 (KR,US);
H03F2200/294 (EP,KR,US);
H03F2200/387 (KR,US);
H03F2200/391 (KR,US);
H03F2200/541 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAUSCHARMER MULTIBANDVERSTÄRKER | [2017/28] | English: | MULTI-BAND LOW NOISE AMPLIFIER | [2017/28] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR MULTIBANDE À FAIBLE BRUIT | [2017/28] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 19.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2015 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | IT | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | NL | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | IE | 25.08.2020 | LU | 25.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | FR | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.08.2015 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 25.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
FR | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
IE | 25.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
FR | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
FR | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
FR | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 25.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
NL | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011018635 (TASIC ALEKSANDAR [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,6-9,12* paragraphs [0054] - [0059]; figure 5 *; | [XI]US2014113578 (XU RUI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13,16,17,19 * paragraphs [0017] - [0095]; figures 1,2,3,6A,9C * [I] 5,10,11,18,20; | [XI]US2014210554 (ABDELHALEM SHERIF [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13,16,17,19 * paragraphs [0019] - [0081]; figures 1,2,3,7A,7B,7C,8A,8B * [I] 5,10,11,18,20; | [XYI]US2014240048 (YOUSSEF AHMED A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,13-17,19 * paragraphs [0015] - [0087]; figures 1,2,3,4,5A,5B,5C,5D,6 * [Y] 3,4,6-9,12 [I] 5,10,11,18,20 |