EP3183462 - BEARING RING AND LAYER BY LAYER METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BEARING RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEER, Oskar Wildbergstr. 2 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | 02 /
GLÖCKNER, Peter Königsbergstr. 3 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 15756831.2 | 27.07.2015 | [2017/26] | WO2015DE200424 | Priority number, date | DE201410216313 | 18.08.2014 Original published format: DE102014216313 | [2017/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016026490 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3183462 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/06, F01D25/12, F01D25/18, F16C33/14, F16C33/64, B22F3/105, F16C33/60, F16C37/00 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
F01D25/125 (EP,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F3/24 (EP,US);
B22F5/10 (EP,US);
C22C33/0271 (EP,US);
F01D25/186 (EP,US);
F16C33/581 (US);
F16C33/583 (EP,US);
F16C33/62 (EP,US);
F16C33/64 (EP,US);
F16C37/007 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
F16C19/06 (EP,US);
F16C2204/62 (EP);
F16C2220/00 (EP,US);
F16C2360/23 (EP,US);
F16C33/60 (EP,US);
F16C33/6659 (US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F2003/241, B22F2201/30, B22F2207/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Title | German: | LAGERRING UND SCHICHTWEISES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LAGERRINGS | [2017/26] | English: | BEARING RING AND LAYER BY LAYER METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BEARING RING | [2017/26] | French: | BAGUE DE PALIER ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION PAR COUCHES D'UNE BAGUE DE PALIER | [2017/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 24.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |