|
16.03.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2019 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.03.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.12.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
07.12.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
14.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.08.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.08.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.08.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.01.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.08.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2017 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2017 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
16.06.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.2017 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.06.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Incoming fax related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
26.05.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.05.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.05.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.10.2015 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.10.2015 |
International Search Report - copy in English for the IB |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
29.10.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
29.10.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.10.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.09.2015 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.09.2015 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2015 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
14.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
21 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
14.08.2015 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |