Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10403306 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2019 | B2 | US2017256272 | 07.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP68796 | 14.08.2015 | DE102014223566 | 19.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6450458B | Global Dossier | 09.01.2019 | B2 | JP2017535204 | 24.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP68796 | 14.08.2015 | DE102014223566 | 19.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3451705 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2020 | B1 | EP3451705 | 06.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP68796 | 14.08.2015 | DE102014223566 | 19.11.2014 | EP15756865 | 14.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107431867B | Global Dossier | 14.01.2020 | B | CN107431867 | 01.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP68796 | 14.08.2015 | DE102014223566 | 19.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015349054B | Global Dossier | 19.04.2018 | B2 | AU2015349054 | 15.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP68796 | 14.08.2015 | DE102014223566 | 19.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3222057 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2019 | B1 | EP3222057 | 27.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP68796 | 14.08.2015 | DE102014223566 | 19.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3222057T | 05.08.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2015EP68796 | 14.08.2015 | DE102014223566 | 19.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3451705T | 11.01.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102014223566 | 19.11.2014 | EP15756865 | 14.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016078786 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014223566 | 19.11.2014 | Type | Divisional application | EP3451705 |