|
28.03.2025 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.2025 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2025 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2025 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2025 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2025 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2025 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 027 |
Appeal |
15 |
|
14.02.2025 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 028 |
Appeal |
56 |
|
14.02.2025 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2025 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.10.2024 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Main request during appeals procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.10.2024 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
20.06.2024 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2024 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
06.05.2024 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2024 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2024 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2024 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2024 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.04.2024 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2024 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.03.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.03.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2024 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2024 |
Request for correction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
261 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
261 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
206 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.02.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
22.01.2024 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2023 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
22.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 016 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 017 |
Opposition |
20 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 018 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 019 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 020 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 021 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 022 |
Opposition |
24 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 023 |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 024 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 025 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 026 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.11.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2023 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 015 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
25.04.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
05.12.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
31 |
|
30.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 08 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
13 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
21 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
722 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
30 |
|
05.10.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.10.2022 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2022 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2022 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2022 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2022 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
20 |
|
05.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
18 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
114 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.10.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.07.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.04.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.04.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
293 |
|
07.04.2021 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
07.04.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
293 |
|
08.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
269 |
|
08.02.2021 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
192 |
|
08.02.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
266 |
|
08.02.2021 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
08.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2021 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
466 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
466 |
|
24.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
514 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
268 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.03.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
652 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
481 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
549 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
723 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
722 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
33 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
496 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
192 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
6 |