EP3197743 - CHASSIS FRAME WITH SPRING CUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility Austria GmbH Siemensstraße 90 1210 Wien / AT | [2020/01] |
Former [2019/30] | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Siemensstraße 90 1210 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2017/31] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Österreich Siemensstrasse 90 1210 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARNER, Christian Ilz 137 A-8262 Ilz / AT | 02 /
SEIFRIED, Radovan Podrgrajsova ulica 6 2000 Maribor / SI | [2017/31] | Representative(s) | Deffner, Rolf Siemens Mobility GmbH Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15757163.9 | 12.08.2015 | [2017/31] | WO2015EP68527 | Priority number, date | AT20140050665 | 22.09.2014 Original published format: AT 506652014 | [2017/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016045864 | Date: | 31.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3197743 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B61F5/52 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
B61F5/52 (EP,AT,CN,RU,US);
B61F5/30 (AT)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] | Title | German: | FAHRWERKSRAHMEN MIT FEDERTOPF | [2017/31] | English: | CHASSIS FRAME WITH SPRING CUP | [2017/31] | French: | CADRE DE TRAIN AVEC CUVETTE DE RESSORT | [2017/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 02.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/01] | 01.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4351242 (IRWIN HOWARD D); | [A]EP0646511 (AMSTED IND INC [US]); | [X]US5546869 (NASSAR RAMI V [US]); | [A]WO2008070953 (NAT STEEL CAR LTD [CA], et al); | [A]WO2014131117 (NAT STEEL CAR LTD [CA], et al) | Examination | US3754514 | DE2514304 | US6142081 |