EP3114665 - CLOUD-MEDIATED VEHICLE NOTIFICATION EXCHANGE FOR LOCALIZED TRANSIT EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inrix, Inc. 10210 NE Points Drive Suite 300 Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | [2017/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEDLIK, Scott 10210 NE Points Drive Suite 300 Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | 02 /
LAGHAEIAN, Raymond 10210 NE Points Drive Suite 300 Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | 03 /
PENDERGRAST, Mark 10210 NE Points Drive Suite 300 Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | Lambsdorff & Lange Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Grillparzerstraße 12A 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/02] | Patentanwälte Lambsdorff & Lange Dingolfinger Strasse 6 81673 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15758305.5 | 03.03.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015US18458 | Priority number, date | US201461946962P | 03.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461946962 P | [2017/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015134476 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3114665 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/09, G08G1/0968, G08G1/0967 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
B60W40/04 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (US);
A61B5/4845 (US);
B60R16/0236 (US);
B60W30/143 (US);
B60W40/08 (US);
B60W40/09 (US);
G01C21/3415 (US);
G01C21/3469 (US);
G01C21/3617 (US);
G01C21/3655 (US);
G01C21/3667 (US);
G01C21/3682 (US);
G05D1/0011 (US);
G06F16/29 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
G06Q40/08 (EP,US);
G07B15/00 (US);
G07B15/063 (EP,US);
G07C5/008 (US);
G08G1/00 (US);
G08G1/0112 (EP,US);
G08G1/012 (US);
G08G1/0129 (EP,US);
G08G1/0133 (EP);
G08G1/0141 (EP,US);
G08G1/0145 (US);
G08G1/065 (US);
G08G1/07 (US);
G08G1/093 (US);
G08G1/0962 (US);
G08G1/0965 (US);
G08G1/0967 (US);
G08G1/096725 (EP,US);
G08G1/096741 (EP,US);
G08G1/096775 (EP,US);
G08G1/096791 (US);
G08G1/096811 (US);
G08G1/096822 (US);
G08G1/096838 (EP,US);
G08G1/097 (US);
H04B1/3822 (US);
H04B7/18504 (US);
H04L67/02 (US);
H04L67/306 (US);
H04L9/3247 (US);
H04M15/60 (US);
H04W12/08 (US);
H04W4/024 (US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W4/40 (US);
H04W4/42 (US);
H04W4/50 (EP,US);
A61B5/024 (US);
A61B5/0531 (US);
B60W2040/0809 (US);
B60W2040/0872 (US);
B60W2050/0075 (EP);
B60W2540/22 (US);
B60W2552/00 (US);
B60W2554/00 (EP);
B60W2555/20 (US);
B60W2556/10 (EP);
B60W2710/1044 (US);
B60W2710/18 (US);
B60W2720/10 (US);
G01C21/3608 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/02] | G08G1/09, G08G1/0968 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Title | German: | CLOUD-VERMITTELTER FAHRZEUGBENACHRICHTIGUNGSAUSTAUSCH FÜR LOKALISIERTE TRANSITEREIGNISSE | [2017/02] | English: | CLOUD-MEDIATED VEHICLE NOTIFICATION EXCHANGE FOR LOCALIZED TRANSIT EVENTS | [2017/02] | French: | ÉCHANGE DE NOTIFICATIONS DE VÉHICULES BASÉ SUR L'INFONUAGIQUE POUR DES ÉVÉNEMENTS DE TRANSIT LOCALISÉS | [2017/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2016 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 27.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 16.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009287401 (LEVINE URI [IL], et al); | [Y]US2009322560 (TENGLER STEVEN C [US], et al) | International search | [XY]US2010060480 (BAI FAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2010161195 (SHIN KWANG-KEUN [US]); | [Y]US2012229301 (GOODWIN CECIL WAYNE HILTON [US]); | [Y]US2013131969 (ROTHSCHILD LEIGH M [US]); | [Y]EP2607941 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]); | [Y]US2014039784 (MILLSPAUGH BEN [US]) |