EP3114705 - METROLOGY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPENSATING FOR OVERLAY ERRORS BY THE METROLOGY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/02] | STATISTICAL OVERLAY ERROR PREDICTION FOR FEED FORWARD AND FEEDBACK CORRECTION OF OVERLAY ERRORS, ROOT CAUSE ANALYSIS AND PROCESS CONTROL | ||
[2022/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLA - Tencor Corporation One Technology Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | [2017/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Wei 1081 Foster City Apt. D Foster City, California 94404 / US | 02 /
RAO, Krishna 3222 Glencoe Circle San Ramon, California 94582 / US | 03 /
GUTIERREZ, Joseph 3864 Pruneridge Avenue Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 04 /
OLAVARRIA, Ramon 41731 Gifford Street Fremont, California 94538 / US | 05 /
MACNAUGHTON, Craig 16768 Corcel Court Los Gatos, California 95032 / US | 06 /
AZORDEGAN, Amir 4471 Billings Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | 07 /
DIGHE, Prasanna 7579 Balmoral Way San Ramon, California 94582 / US | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2017/02] | Keane, Paul Fachtna FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 15758366.7 | 05.03.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015US18884 | Priority number, date | US201461949022P | 06.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461949022 P | US201414220665 | 20.03.2014 Original published format: US201414220665 | [2017/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015134709 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3114705 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3114705 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/66, G01B9/02, G03F7/20, G06F30/398, G06N20/00, // G06F119/18 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
G03F7/705 (EP,KR,US);
G03F1/36 (KR,US);
G03F7/706 (KR);
G03F7/70633 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/706833 (KR);
G03F7/706837 (KR);
G06F30/39 (KR,US);
G06F30/398 (EP,KR,US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/45] | H01L21/66, G01B9/02, G03F7/20, G06F17/50 | ||
Former IPC [2017/02] | H01L21/66, G01B9/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METROLOGIESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM KOMPENSIEREN VON ÜBERLAGERUNGSFEHLERN DURCH DAS METROLOGIESYSTEM | [2022/24] | English: | METROLOGY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPENSATING FOR OVERLAY ERRORS BY THE METROLOGY SYSTEM | [2022/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE METROLOGIE ET PROCEDE POUR LA CORRECTION D'ERREURS DE SUPERPOSITION PAR LE SYSTEME DE METROLOGIE | [2022/24] |
Former [2017/02] | STATISTISCHE ÜBERLAGERUNGSFEHLERPRÄDIKTION FÜR FEEDFORWARD- UND FEEDBACKKORREKTUR VON ÜBERLAGERUNGSFEHLERN, GRUNDURSACHENANALYSE UND PROZESSSTEUERUNG | ||
Former [2017/02] | STATISTICAL OVERLAY ERROR PREDICTION FOR FEED FORWARD AND FEEDBACK CORRECTION OF OVERLAY ERRORS, ROOT CAUSE ANALYSIS AND PROCESS CONTROL | ||
Former [2017/02] | PRÉDICTION D'ERREUR DE SUPERPOSITION STATISTIQUE POUR LA CORRECTION EN FLUX AVANT ET EN FLUX ARRIÈRE D'ERREURS DE SUPERPOSITION, ANALYSE DES CAUSES RACINES ET CONTRÔLE DE PROCESSUS | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 17.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.11.2022 | AT | 23.11.2022 | CZ | 23.11.2022 | DK | 23.11.2022 | EE | 23.11.2022 | ES | 23.11.2022 | FI | 23.11.2022 | HR | 23.11.2022 | IT | 23.11.2022 | LT | 23.11.2022 | LV | 23.11.2022 | MC | 23.11.2022 | NL | 23.11.2022 | PL | 23.11.2022 | RO | 23.11.2022 | RS | 23.11.2022 | SE | 23.11.2022 | SI | 23.11.2022 | SK | 23.11.2022 | SM | 23.11.2022 | NO | 23.02.2023 | GR | 24.02.2023 | GB | 05.03.2023 | IE | 05.03.2023 | LU | 05.03.2023 | IS | 23.03.2023 | PT | 23.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | CH | 31.03.2023 | FR | 31.03.2023 | LI | 31.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
GB | 05.03.2023 | ||
IE | 05.03.2023 | ||
LU | 05.03.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
BE | 31.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
FR | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
GB | 05.03.2023 | ||
IE | 05.03.2023 | ||
LU | 05.03.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
CH | 31.03.2023 | ||
LI | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
GB | 05.03.2023 | ||
IE | 05.03.2023 | ||
LU | 05.03.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
LU | 05.03.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NL | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 23.11.2022 | |
NO | 23.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US7042552 (WERKMAN ROY [NL], et al); | [YA]US2009063378 (IZIKSON PAVEL [IL]); | [YA]WO2013178404 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]) | International search | [A]US2003223630 (ADEL MICHAEL [IL], et al); | [Y]US2009063378 (IZIKSON PAVEL [IL]); | [A]US2011154272 (HSU WEI TE [TW], et al); | [A]US2013060354 (CHOI DONGSUB [KR], et al); | [XY]WO2013178404 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]) | by applicant | US7042552 |