24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
02.02.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
03.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
04.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
24.02.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
14.02.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.02.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.02.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.10.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.04.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.02.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.09.2017 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
22.09.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
22.09.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.06.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] |
14.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.12.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
09.12.2016 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
09.12.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
23.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
22.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|