EP3178128 - ARRANGEMENT FOR GALVANICALLY ISOLATED ENERGY TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/24] | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR THE GALVANICALLY SEPARATED ENERGY TRANSMISSION | ||
[2020/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/24] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERGIN, Dominik Waaggasse 14 91083 Baiersdorf / DE | 02 /
LANGE, Dennie Eulerstrasse 2A 91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
MARTIUS, Sebastian Spitalstrasse 4 91301 Forchheim / DE | 04 /
SEWIOLO, Benjamin Am Pfarrhof 1B 90587 Obermichelbach / DE | 05 /
ZIROFF, Andreas Wemdinger Strasse 30 81671 München / DE | [2017/24] | Application number, filing date | 15760127.9 | 31.08.2015 | [2017/24] | WO2015EP69841 | Priority number, date | DE201410217932 | 08.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014217932 | [2017/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016037881 | Date: | 17.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3178128 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3178128 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01P3/16, H01P5/12 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
H01P3/16 (EP,CN,US);
H01P5/12 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/24] | H01P3/16, H01P5/12, G02B6/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR GALVANISCH GETRENNTEN ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNG | [2020/04] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR GALVANICALLY ISOLATED ENERGY TRANSMISSION | [2020/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE AVEC ISOLATION GALVANIQUE | [2020/04] |
Former [2017/24] | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR GALVANISCH GETRENNTEN ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNG | ||
Former [2017/24] | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR THE GALVANICALLY SEPARATED ENERGY TRANSMISSION | ||
Former [2017/24] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE AVEC ISOLATION GALVANIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 25.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.08.2015 | AL | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | TR | 17.06.2020 | AT | 31.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | IE | 31.08.2020 | LU | 31.08.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 31.08.2015 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MT | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
TR | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 31.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 31.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
LU | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB736365 (TELEFUNKEN GMBH) [A] 1-11 * page 1, line 52 - line 75 * * page 2, line 23 - line 67; figure 1 *; | [XA]US3746424 (HERMSTEIN W) [X] 1 * column 1, line 3 - line 58 * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 2; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-11; | [XI]GB2185860 (JUNKOSHA CO LTD) [X] 1,4-6,9,12 * page 1, line 13 - line 30; figure 5 * * page 2, line 26 - line 97; figures 1(a)-4 * [I] 2,7,8,10,11; | [A]US6437663 (KII HIRONORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* column 10, line 43 - column 12, line 52; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US7109823 (SCHAFFNER JAMES H [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 5 - line 13 * * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 46; figures 1-2 * * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 44; figures 2-3 *; | [XA]US2012133306 (SELIGER NORBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-11 |