EP3348099 - FINGERPRINT POSITIONING FOR MOBILE TERMINALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2018/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIGREN, Torbjörn Ekvaegen 9 S-756 53 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
WANG, Meng c/o Naibin Bai Brogatan 10 S-174 66 Sundbyberg / SE | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2024/21] |
Former [2018/29] | Bertsch, Florian Oliver Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15760202.0 | 11.09.2015 | [2018/29] | WO2015EP70808 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017041850 | Date: | 16.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3348099 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3348099 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00, G01S5/00, G01S5/02, G06F16/9537, H04W24/10 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
G01S11/04 (US);
G01S11/06 (US);
G01S5/02521 (EP,US);
G01S5/02526 (EP,US);
G01S5/02527 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/29] | H04W64/00, G01S5/00, H04W24/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FINGERABDRUCK-POSITIONIERUNG FÜR MOBILE ENDGERÄTE | [2023/43] | English: | FINGERPRINT POSITIONING FOR MOBILE TERMINALS | [2018/29] | French: | POSITIONNEMENT PAR EMPREINTES DIGITALES POUR LES TERMINAUX MOBILES | [2023/43] |
Former [2018/29] | FINGERABDRUCKPOSITIONIERUNG FÜR MOBILE ENDGERÄTE | ||
Former [2018/29] | POSITIONNEMENT D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES POUR TERMINAUX MOBILES | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 11.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24177030.4 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012044246 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [I]US2015018017 (JANG JIWOONG [KR], et al); | Examination | WO2012044246 | US2015018017 | by applicant | WO2011040856 |