EP3174643 - INTRAVASCULAR ULTRASOUND IMAGING APPARATUS, INTERFACE ARCHITECTURE, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | For all designated states Philips Image Guided Therapy Corporation 3721 Valley Centre Drive, Suite 500 San Diego CA 92130 / US | [2021/04] |
Former [2020/12] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states Volcano Corporation 3721 Valley Center Drive Suite 500 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
Former [2017/23] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states Volcano Corporation 3721 Valley Center Drive Suite 500 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORL, Paul Douglas c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/16] |
Former [2017/23] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 15760268.1 | 29.07.2015 | [2017/23] | WO2015IB55704 | Priority number, date | US201462032368P | 01.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462032368 P | [2017/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016016810 | Date: | 04.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3174643 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3174643 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, A61B8/00, A61B8/12, B06B1/06 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/445 (EP,US);
A61B8/4494 (EP,US);
A61B8/5207 (EP,US);
B06B1/0633 (EP,US);
A61B8/56 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/23] | B06B1/06, A61B8/00, A61B8/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRAVASKULÄRE ULTRASCHALLBILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SCHNITTSTELLENARCHITEKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2017/23] | English: | INTRAVASCULAR ULTRASOUND IMAGING APPARATUS, INTERFACE ARCHITECTURE, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING | [2017/23] | French: | APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE ÉCHOGRAPHIQUE INTRAVASCULAIRE, ARCHITECTURE D'INTERFACE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 28.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005146247 (FISHER RAYETTE A [US], et al) [A] 1,13,23 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0062] *; | [YA]US2007264732 (CHEN JINGKUANG [US]) [Y] 8,15 * paragraph [0025] * [A] 27; | [XYI]US2010262014 (HUANG YONGLI [US]) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,13,14,16-19,22-26,29-31 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 1-4, 13-16 * [Y] 5,6,8,11,12,15,20,21,32 [I] 27,28; | [Y]US2010280388 (HUANG YONGLI [US]) [Y] 6 * figure 9 *; | [YD]US7846101 (EBERLE MICHAEL J [US], et al) [YD] 5,11,12,20,32 * column 7, line 12 - line 27 * * figure 2 * * column 10, line 5 - line 33 *; | [A]US2013310679 (NATARAJAN SHYAM [US], et al) [A] 1,5,13,20,23* paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0067] *; | [Y] - Don Isarakorn, "POUR L'OBTENTION DU GRADE DE DOCTEUR ÈS SCIENCES acceptée sur proposition du jury: Epitaxial Piezoelectric MEMS on Silicon", Thèse N. 4939(2011) - Faculté sciences at techniques de l'ingénieur - Ecole Polytechnique Fédérale de Lausanne, (20110126), URL: http://infoscience.epfl.ch/record/155040/files/EPFL_TH4939.pdf, (20151023), XP055223303 [Y] 21 * page 94, line 19 - line 21 * | [A] - XUEFENG ZHUANG ET AL, "Fabrication of Flexible Transducer Arrays With Through-Wafer Electrical Interconnects Based on Trench Refilling With PDMS", JOURNAL OF MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, US, (20080401), vol. 17, no. 2, ISSN 1057-7157, pages 446 - 452, XP011206589 [A] 25 * paragraph [0001] * | [A] - WONG K A ET AL, "Curved micromachined ultrasonic transducers", 2003 IEEE ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS. HONOLULU, HAWAII, OCT. 5 - 8, 2003; [IEEE ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20031005), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ULTSYM.2003.1293468, ISBN 978-0-7803-7922-0, pages 572 - 576, XP010702127 [A] 25,26 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.2003.1293468 | by applicant | US6641540 | US6776763 | US7226417 | US7846101 |