EP3200694 - OPTICAL VITAL SIGNS SENSOR. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2017/32] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAULUSSEN, Elvira Johanna Maria High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CORNELISSEN, Hugo Johan High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | Kruk, Arno Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 15760493.5 | 14.09.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015EP70911 | Priority number, date | EP20140187495 | 02.10.2014 Original published format: EP 14187495 | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016050486 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3200694 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/1455, A61B5/024, G01N21/47, G01N21/49 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
A61B5/02427 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/024 (RU);
A61B5/02438 (US);
A61B5/14552 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2562/0233 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2562/0238 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2562/0242 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2021/4752 (US);
G01N2021/4757 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER LEBENSZEICHENSENSOR | [2017/32] | English: | OPTICAL VITAL SIGNS SENSOR. | [2017/32] | French: | CAPTEUR OPTIQUE DE SIGNES VITAUX | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 02.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP0527703 (HATSCHEK RUDOLF A [CH]) [X] 1,8-11 * abstract * * column 9, line 40 - column 10, line 9 * * column 10, line 39 - column 11, line 44 * * column 24, line 36 - column 25, line 24 * [Y] 2-6 [I] 7; | [Y]US2012083673 (AL-ALI AMMAR [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0092] , [0128] - [0138] - [0142] , [0145] *; | [Y]US6745061 (HICKS CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 34 * * column 13, lines 39-52 *; | [XI]WO2009030934 (UNIV LOUGHBOROUGH [GB], et al) [X] 1,8-11 * abstract * * page 1, lines 3-5 * * page 9, line 18 - page 10, line 28 * * page 13, lines 9-25 * [I] 7 | by applicant | US2009033937 |