EP3118896 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi, 448-8661 / JP | [2021/09] |
Former [2017/10] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2017/03] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KADOGUCHI, Takuya c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
HIRANO, Takahiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
KAWASHIMA, Takanori c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
FUKUTANI, Keita c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi, 448-8661 / JP | 05 /
OKUMURA, Tomomi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi, 448-8661 / JP | 06 /
NISHIHATA, Masayoshi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi, 448-8661 / JP | [2021/09] |
Former [2017/10] | 01 /
KADOGUCHI, Takuya c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
HIRANO, Takahiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWASHIMA, Takanori c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
FUKUTANI, Keita c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8661 / JP | |||
05 /
OKUMURA, Tomomi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8661 / JP | |||
06 /
NISHIHATA, Masayoshi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2017/03] | 01 /
KADOGUCHI, Takuya c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
HIRANO, Takahiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWASHIMA, Takanori c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
FUKUTANI, Keita c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | |||
05 /
OKUMURA, Tomomi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | |||
06 /
NISHIHATA, Masayoshi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/09] |
Former [2017/03] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 15760740.9 | 15.01.2015 | [2017/03] | WO2015JP50894 | Priority number, date | JP20140046595 | 10.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014046595 | [2017/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015136968 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3118896 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3118896 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | [2017/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3118896 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/495, // H01L25/07 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
H01L23/49513 (EP,US);
H01L21/4825 (US);
H01L21/4882 (US);
H01L21/565 (US);
H01L23/3142 (US);
H01L23/4334 (EP,US);
H01L23/49537 (EP,US);
H01L23/49551 (EP,US);
H01L23/49562 (EP,US);
H01L23/49568 (US);
H01L23/49575 (EP,US);
H01L24/00 (US);
H01L24/37 (EP);
H01L24/40 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L24/84 (EP);
H01L24/92 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04026 (EP);
H01L2224/04034 (EP);
H01L2224/06181 (EP);
H01L2224/29083 (EP);
H01L2224/29111 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/33181 (EP,US);
H01L2224/35825 (EP);
H01L2224/37013 (EP);
H01L2224/37565 (EP);
H01L2224/37572 (EP);
H01L2224/37644 (EP);
H01L2224/37655 (EP);
H01L2224/37664 (EP);
H01L2224/40175 (EP);
H01L2224/40245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/40499 (EP);
H01L2224/40996 (EP);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45147 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73215 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73221 (EP);
H01L2224/73263 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83138 (EP);
H01L2224/83801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/84007 (EP);
H01L2224/84138 (EP,US);
H01L2224/84143 (EP);
H01L2224/84345 (EP);
H01L2224/84385 (EP);
H01L2224/84801 (EP);
H01L2224/92165 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92166 (EP);
H01L2224/92242 (EP);
H01L2224/92246 (EP);
H01L2224/92247 (EP);
H01L23/3121 (EP,US);
H01L23/3135 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/33 (EP,US);
H01L24/35 (EP);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1203 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/29111, H01L2924/014, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/35825, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/37644, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/37655, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/37664, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/40499, H01L2924/01028 (EP);
H01L2224/40499, H01L2924/014 (EP);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45147, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73221, H01L2224/40245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/92242, H01L2224/27 (EP);
H01L2224/92247, H01L2224/27 (EP);
H01L2224/92247, H01L2224/27, H01L2224/83 (EP);
H01L2224/92247, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/92247, H01L2224/83 (EP); |
Former IPC [2017/03] | H01L23/48, H01L25/07, H01L25/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2017/03] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2017/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2017/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2016 | Translation filed | 08.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 08.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.01.2015 | AL | 03.03.2021 | AT | 03.03.2021 | CY | 03.03.2021 | CZ | 03.03.2021 | DK | 03.03.2021 | EE | 03.03.2021 | ES | 03.03.2021 | FI | 03.03.2021 | HR | 03.03.2021 | IT | 03.03.2021 | LT | 03.03.2021 | LV | 03.03.2021 | MC | 03.03.2021 | MK | 03.03.2021 | MT | 03.03.2021 | NL | 03.03.2021 | PL | 03.03.2021 | RO | 03.03.2021 | RS | 03.03.2021 | SE | 03.03.2021 | SI | 03.03.2021 | SK | 03.03.2021 | SM | 03.03.2021 | BG | 03.06.2021 | NO | 03.06.2021 | GR | 04.06.2021 | IS | 03.07.2021 | PT | 05.07.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 15.01.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
MK | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 15.01.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CY | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.01.2015 | |
AL | 03.03.2021 | ||
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
MC | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
IT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SI | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
DK | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.03.2021 | |
AT | 03.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
ES | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
IS | 03.07.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RO | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SK | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
PT | 05.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
CZ | 03.03.2021 | ||
EE | 03.03.2021 | ||
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 03.03.2021 | |
FI | 03.03.2021 | ||
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
SM | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
NL | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
PL | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
SE | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
LV | 03.03.2021 | ||
RS | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
BG | 03.06.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
GR | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
HR | 03.03.2021 | ||
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.03.2021 | |
LT | 03.03.2021 | ||
NO | 03.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008166626 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1,2,5,6* figure 7 *; | [X]JP2013016623 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,2,5,7 * figures 17, 1b * | International search | [Y]JP2005136018 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-7* , paragraphs [0035] to [0039], [0052], [0059], [0069]; fig. 1, 2 & US 2005/0093131 A1 & DE 102004052653 A & CN 1612331 A *; | [Y]JP2012235081 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0032] to [0053], [0162], [0163]; fig. 1, 15 & US 2014/0035112 A1 & EP 2704193 A1 & EP 2700095 A & WO 2012/143784 A2 & CN 103493197 A & KR 10-2013-0133052 A * | Examination | JP2013149684 | JP2014154780 |