EP3118196 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HETEROARYLCARBOXYLIC ACID ESTER DERIVATIVE, AND PRODUCTION INTERMEDIATE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EA Pharma Co., Ltd. 2-1-1, Irifune Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0042 / JP | [2017/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKASHITA, Ryuta c/o EA PHARMA CO., LTD. 1-1, Suzuki-cho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | Dunne, Paul David, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15760831.6 | 11.03.2015 | [2017/03] | WO2015JP57178 | Priority number, date | JP20140048091 | 11.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014048091 | [2017/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015137408 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3118196 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/38, C07D333/40 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
C07D333/38 (EP,US);
C07D333/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/03] | C07D333/40, C07D333/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HETEROARYLCARBOXYLSÄUREESTERDERIVATS UND HERSTELLUNGSZWISCHENPRODUKT DAVON | [2017/03] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HETEROARYLCARBOXYLIC ACID ESTER DERIVATIVE, AND PRODUCTION INTERMEDIATE OF SAME | [2017/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE DÉRIVÉ D'ESTER D'ACIDE HÉTÉROARYLCARBOXYLIQUE, ET SON INTERMÉDIAIRE DE PRODUCTION | [2017/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2016 | Translation filed | 06.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 06.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2511271 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [Y] 3-13 * Ex 37, step 1 on page 35 *; | [YP]EP2725016 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [YP] 3-13* page 73, Ref Example 1 * | International search | [X]WO9959992 (HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL DE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 13, 15 * , example 1 (b); exanple 2 (f); formula XII, definitions of group R25 & EP 960882 A1 & AU 4138599 A & EP 1086098 A1 & AR 18358 A & JP 2002-515500 A & US 6566366 B1 & TW 546294 B & US 2003/0153557 A1 & TW 254710 B *; | [A]WO2011071048 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP], et al) [A] 6-19* , general formula (I), definitions of group A; table 1-1, no.M-4; table 1-3, no.M-23; table 2-1, no.A-6; table 2-7, no.B-6; table 2-9, no.B-19 & EP 2511271 A1 & US 2012/0283222 A1 & CN 102822154 A & US 2014/0080790 A1 & JP 5482800 B & US 2015/0011511 A1 *; | [X]WO2012169579 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP], et al) [X] 13-17 * , example 27, step 2; example 28, step 2; general formula (I), definitions of X & US 2014/0094489 A1 & EP 2725016 A1 *; | [XA]WO2013187533 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [X] 1-3, 6-19 * , page 67, schemes, productions of (E) from (L); example 1, step 4; page 64, schemes, productions of (H) from (E); page 66, schemes, productions of (I) from (H); example 5, steps 8 to 9; table 1-2, no.18, page 65, 128 to page 66, 15; table 1-10, no.87 & US 2013/0338132 A1 & AU 2013275197 A & CA 2876 * [A] 4-5 | [A] - GREENE T.W. et al., Protecting Groups in Organic Synthesis, (19990000), pages 404 - 8 [A] 1-19 |