EP3117583 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR CONVERGED NETWORKING AND STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diamanti, Inc. 111 North Market Street, Suite 800 San Jose, California 95113 / US | [2017/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOU, Jeffrey 668 Chimalus Drive Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
SHARMA, Gopal 3631 Place De Louis San Jose, California 95148 / US | 03 /
GUHA, Amitava 6127 Royal Ann Drive San Jose, California 95129 / US | 04 /
FONG, Kevin 1417 Iron Hill Lane Las Vegas, Nevada 89134 / US | 05 /
GANESH, Jayasenan Sundara 1101 Hollyhead Lane Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15761423.1 | 06.03.2015 | [2017/03] | WO2015US19206 | Priority number, date | US201461950036P | 08.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461950036 P | US201462017257P | 26.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462017257 P | [2017/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015138245 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3117583 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.09.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F3/06 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
G06F9/45541 (EP,KR,US);
H04L67/1097 (EP,KR,US);
G06F13/1642 (US);
G06F3/061 (EP,US);
G06F3/0664 (EP,US);
G06F3/067 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME FÜR KONVERGIERTE VERNETZUNG UND SPEICHERUNG | [2017/03] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR CONVERGED NETWORKING AND STORAGE | [2017/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR FAIRE CONVERGER UN STOCKAGE ET UNE MISE EN RÉSEAU | [2017/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 05.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.06.2021 | 17.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/46] | 12.07.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.05.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 05.05.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2372521 (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,14 * figures 1,2,3 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0023] * [I] 6,9-13; | [I]US2013198312 (TAMIR ELIEZER [IL], et al) [I] 1-14 * figures 1,5 * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0064] ** paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0086] * | International search | [A]KR20080052846 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) [A] 1-27* See paragraphs [0026]-[0029]; and figure 2. *; | [A]US2009003361 (BAKTHAVATHSALAM RANGA [US]) [A] 1-27 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0045]; and figures 3a-4c. *; | [XY]US2010005234 (GANGA ILANGO S [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0017], [0021]-[0028], [0036], [0039]; and figure 1. * [Y] 11-27; | [Y]US2013198312 (TAMIR ELIEZER [IL], et al) [Y] 11-27 * See paragraphs [0021], [0023], [0037], [0062], [0084], [0087], [0100]-[0101]; and figures 5-6, 9. *; | [A]US2013232267 (SHATZKAMER KEVIN D [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0013], [0033]-[0034]; and figures 1-2. * |