EP3233882 - FLUORINATED CYCLIC DINUCLEOTIDES FOR CYTOKINE INDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/43] | CYCLIC DINUCLEOTIDES FOR CYTOKINE INDUCTION | ||
[2019/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kayla Therapeutics 77 avenue de Toulouse 31240 L'Union / FR | [2019/07] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Invivogen 5 rue Jean Rodier ZI de Montaudran 31400 Toulouse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERNEJOUL, Fabienne Rés. Jardin Royal II, Appart 90D 1 Chemin du Marin 31100 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
TIRABY, Gérard 39 Chemin des Côtes de Pech David, Villa 41 31400 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
LIOUX, Thierry 1 rue Raoul Follereau Cyprié Village 31130 Balma / FR | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15762583.1 | 09.09.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015EP70635 | Priority number, date | EP20140307054 | 16.12.2014 Original published format: EP 14307054 | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016096174 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3233882 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3233882 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, A61K31/7084, A61P37/00 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
C07H21/04 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/7084 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/7084, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | C07H21/00, A61K31/7084, A61P37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORINIERTE CYCLISCHE DINUKLEOTIDE ZUR CYTOKININDUKTION | [2019/25] | English: | FLUORINATED CYCLIC DINUCLEOTIDES FOR CYTOKINE INDUCTION | [2019/25] | French: | DINUCLÉOTIDES CYCLIQUES FLUORÉS POUR L'INDUCTION DE LA CYTOKINE | [2019/25] |
Former [2017/43] | CYCLISCHE DINUKLEOTIDE ZUR CYTOKININDUKTION | ||
Former [2017/43] | CYCLIC DINUCLEOTIDES FOR CYTOKINE INDUCTION | ||
Former [2017/43] | DINUCLÉOTIDES CYCLIQUES POUR L'INDUCTION DE CYTOKINES | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 16.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19174902.7 / EP3546473 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2015 | AL | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | TR | 30.10.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | GR | 31.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 09.09.2015 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.09.2015 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | HR | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | LT | 30.10.2019 | |
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | LT | 30.10.2019 | |
BG | 30.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014179335 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * page 37, paragraphs 99-100 * * page 2, paragraph 0003 * * page 82, paragraphs 0218-0220; claim - * * figure S7B *; | [AD]WO2014189805 (AURO BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-12 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 9; claim - * * page 12, paragraph 66 * * page 19, paragraph 89 * * claim - *; | [A] - TAKAFUMI TEZUKA ET AL, "Synthesis of 2'-Modified Cyclic Bis(3'-5')diadenylic Acids (c-di-AMPs) and Their Promotion of Cell Division in a Freshwater Green Alga", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (20121208), vol. 41, no. 12, doi:10.1246/cl.2012.1723, ISSN 0366-7022, pages 1723 - 1725, XP055172477 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * *Page 1723; Chart 1; compound 1c* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/cl.2012.1723 | [AD] - CARLY A. SHANAHAN ET AL, "Identification of c-di-GMP Derivatives Resistant to an EAL Domain Phosphodiesterase", BIOCHEMISTRY, (20130115), vol. 52, no. 2, doi:10.1021/bi301510v, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 365 - 377, XP055172476 [AD] 1-12 * abstract * * page 369; figure 3; compounds c-di-2'F-GMP * * "Enzymatic Hydrolysis of Analogues containing ribose modifications"; page 370, column left, paragraph last - column right, paragraph first * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi301510v | [A] - BENJAMIN T. ROEMBKE ET AL, "A cyclic dinucleotide containing 2-aminopurine is a general fluorescent sensor for c-di-GMP and 3',3'-cGAMP", MOLECULAR BIOSYSTEMS, (20140328), vol. 10, no. 6, doi:10.1039/c3mb70518h, ISSN 1742-206X, page 1568, XP055172186 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1569; figure 1; compound 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3mb70518h | [AD] - LINGYIN LI ET AL, "Hydrolysis of 2'3'-cGAMP by ENPP1 and design of nonhydrolyzable analogs", NATURE CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, (20141026), vol. 10, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nchembio.1661, ISSN 1552-4450, pages 1043 - 1048, XP055172172 [AD] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1043, column left; figure 4; compounds 4-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nchembio.1661 | by applicant | US2014066436 | US2014205653 | US2014329889 | WO2014189805 | US2015056224 | WO2015077354 | - ABLASSER, A.; GOLDECK, M.; CAVLAR, T.; DEIMLING, T.; WITTE, G.; ROHL, I.; HOMUNG, V., "cGAS produces a 2'-5'-linked cyclic dinucleotide second messenger that activates STING", NATURE, (2013), vol. 498, no. 7454, pages 380 - 384 | - CHEN, H.; SUN, H.; YOU, F.; SUN, W.; ZHOU, X.; CHEN, L.; JIANG, Z., "Activation of STAT6 by STING is critical for antiviral innate immunity", CELL, (2011), vol. 147, no. 2, pages 436 - 446 | - DANILCHANKA, 0.; MEKALANOS, J. J., "Cyclic dinucleotides and the innate immune response", CELL, (2013), vol. 154, no. 5, pages 962 - 970 | - DINER, E. J.; BURDETTE, D. L.; WILSON, S. C.; MONROE, K. M.; KELLENBERGER, C. A.; HYODO, M.; VANCE, R. E., "The innate immune DNA sensor cGAS produces a noncanonical cyclic dinucleotide that activates human STING", CELL REP, (2013), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 1355 - 1361 | - DUBENSKY, T. W., JR.; KANNE, D. B.; LEONG, M. L., "Rationale, progress and development of vaccines utilizing STING-activating cyclic dinucleotide adjuvants", THERADV VACCINES, (2013), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 131 - 143 | - FENSTERL, V.; WHITE, C. L.; YAMASHITA, M.; SEN, G. C., "Novel characteristics of the function and induction of murine p56 family proteins", J VIROL, (2008), vol. 82, no. 22, pages 11045 - 11053 | - GOMELSKY, M., "cAMP, c-di-GMP, c-di-AMP and now cGMP: bacteria use them all!", MOL MICROBIOL, (2011), vol. 79, no. 3, pages 562 - 565 | - HECKER, S. J.; ERION, M. D., "Prodrugs of phosphates and phosphonates", J MED CHEM, (2008), vol. 51, no. 8, pages 2328 - 2345 | - HERDEWIJNA, P. V. A. A. A. K. L., "Synthesis of Nucleosides Fluorinated in the Sugar Moiety. The Application of Diethylaminosulfur Trifluoride to the Synthesis of Fluorinated Nucleosides", NUCLEOSIDES AND NUCLEOTIDES, (1989), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 65 - 96 | - JONES, R. B., N., "Nucleotide prodrugs", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 27, no. 1-2, pages 1 - 17 | - LI, L.; YIN, Q.; KUSS, P.; MALIGA, Z.; MILLAN, J. L.; WU, H.; MITCHISON, T. J., "Hydrolysis of 2'3'-cGAMP by ENPP1 and design of nonhydrolyzable analogs", NAT CHEM BIOL, (2014), vol. 10, no. 12, pages 1043 - 1048 | - RAUTIO, J.; KUMPULAINEN, H.; HEIMBACH, T.; OLIYAI, R.; OH, D.; JARVINEN, T.; SAVOLAINEN, J., "Prodrugs: design and clinical applications", NAT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2008), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 255 - 270 | - ROSS, B. S. S., R.H.; SPRANKLE, K.G.; VASQUEZ, G., "An Efficient and Scalable Synthesis of Arabinosylguanine and 2'-Deoxy-2'-Fluoro-guanosine", NUCLEOSIDES AND NUCLEOTIDES, (1997), vol. 16, no. 7-9, pages 1645 - 1647 | - SHANAHAN, C. A.; GAFFNEY, B. L.; JONES, R. A.; STROBEL, S. A., "Identification of c-di-GMP derivatives resistant to an EAL domain phosphodiesterase", BIOCHEMISTRY, (2013), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 365 - 377 | - SIMM, R.; MORR, M.; KADER, A.; NIMTZ, M.; ROMLING, U., "GGDEF and EAL domains inversely regulate cyclic di-GMP levels and transition from sessility to motility", MOL MICROBIOL, (2004), vol. 53, no. 4, pages 1123 - 1134 | - THOMAS, H. J.; TIWARIA, K.N.; CLAYTONA, S.J.; SECRIST J.A.; MONTGOMERY J.A, "Synthesis and Biologic Activity of Purine 2'-Deoxy-2'-fluoro-ribonucleosides", NUCLEOSIDES AND NUCLEOTIDES, (1994), vol. 13, no. 1-3, pages 309 - 323 | - ZHANG, X.; SHI, H.; WU, J.; ZHANG, X.; SUN, L.; CHEN, C.; CHEN, Z. J., "Cyclic GMP-AMP containing mixed phosphodiester linkages is an endogenous high-affinity ligand for STING", MOL CELL, (2013), vol. 51, no. 2, pages 226 - 235 |